Hyde-El v. Nethken et al
Plaintiff: Mason White Hyed-El and Mason White Hyde-El
Defendant: Nathan Vargas, Michael Nethken and Roger Vargas
Case Number: 3:2020cv00113
Filed: February 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2020 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (Sealed - Court) by Mason White Hyde-El (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(brj)
March 16, 2020 Filing 5 Prisoner Admin Remedy Statement by Mason White Hyde-El (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ni)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Prisoner Trust Account Statement of Plaintiff. Signed by Clerk of Court on 3/10/2020. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(reh)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER advising Plaintiff of several essential requirements of proceeding in this Court. Signed by Clerk of Court, Frank G. Johns, on 3/10/2020. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (maf)
February 25, 2020 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT - 1983 Application IFP (Sealed - Participants) re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ctb)
February 25, 2020 Filing 1 Pro Se COMPLAINT against Michael Nethken, Nathan Vargas, filed by Mason White Hyed-El. (Attachments: #1 Summonses, #2 Envelope)(ctb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hyde-El v. Nethken et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Vargas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Nethken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Vargas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mason White Hyed-El
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mason White Hyde-El
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?