Charlotte-Mecklenburg Board of Education v. 34 ED, LLC
Plaintiff: Charlotte-Mecklenburg Board of Education
Defendant: 34 ED, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00259
Filed: April 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2020 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint or, Alternatively, to Dismiss This Action by 34 ED, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Attachment 1, #3 Attachment 2, #4 Attachment 3, #5 Attachment 4, #6 Attachment 5)(Harrington, Robert) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/17/2020) (clc).
June 9, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint or, Alternatively, to Dismiss This Action by Charlotte-Mecklenburg Board of Education. Replies due by 6/16/2020 (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits (CMS Response to Motion to Dismiss), #2 Exhibit Ex. A Demand for Arbitration with the American Arbitration Association, #3 Exhibit Ex. B Scope of Work Document, #4 Exhibit Ex. C Petition to Compel Arbitration, #5 Exhibit Ex. D Motion to Compel Arbitration, #6 Exhibit Ex. E CMBE Answer to Petition to Compel Arbitration, #7 Exhibit Ex. F Opposition to CTX Motion to Compel Arbitration, #8 Exhibit Ex. G CMS Request for Proposal, #9 Exhibit Ex. H Notarized Affidavit - A. Shire, #10 Exhibit Ex. I Affidavit of Greg Bame, #11 Exhibit Ex. J Notarized Affidavit - D. Root, #12 Exhibit Ex. K Affidavit of Charles Jeter, #13 Exhibit Ex. L Affidavit of Andre Mayes)(Kemp, Deja)
June 2, 2020 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Charlotte-Mecklenburg Board of Education. (Kemp, Deja)
May 26, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by 34 ED, LLC. Replies due by 6/2/2020 (Harrington, Robert)
May 26, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 34 ED, LLC (Harrington, Robert)
May 26, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Gabriel J. Wright on behalf of 34 ED, LLC (Wright, Gabriel)
May 26, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Cary Baxter Davis on behalf of 34 ED, LLC (Davis, Cary)
May 26, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint or, Alternatively, to Dismiss This Action by 34 ED, LLC. (Harrington, Robert)
May 26, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint or, Alternatively, to Dismiss This Action by 34 ED, LLC. Responses due by 6/9/2020 (Attachments: #1 Appendix Index to Motion, #2 Attachment 1, #3 Attachment 2, #4 Attachment 3)(Harrington, Robert)
May 12, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Deja Dorothy Kemp on behalf of Charlotte-Mecklenburg Board of Education (Kemp, Deja)
May 11, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Charlotte-Mecklenburg Board of Education. Responses due by 5/26/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Enjoin Arbitration Proceedings, #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit Ex. A Demand for Arbitration with the American Arbitration Association, #4 Exhibit Ex. B Scope of Work Document, #5 Exhibit Ex. C Petition to Compel Arbitration, #6 Exhibit Ex. D Motion to Compel Arbitration, #7 Exhibit Ex. E Plaintiffs Request for Proposals, #8 Exhibit Ex. F Affidavit of Amy Shire, #9 Exhibit Ex. G Affidavit of Greg Bame, #10 Exhibit Ex. H Affidavit of Derek Root, #11 Exhibit Ex. I CMS Policy DJ)(Root, Hope) Modified text on 5/12/2020 (ams).
April 29, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to 34 ED, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (brj)
April 29, 2020 Case assigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj)
April 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 34 ED, LLC with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4476945), filed by Charlotte-Mecklenburg Board of Education. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Root, Hope)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charlotte-Mecklenburg Board of Education v. 34 ED, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 34 ED, LLC
Represented By: Gabriel J. Wright
Represented By: Robert Evans Harrington
Represented By: Cary Baxter Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte-Mecklenburg Board of Education
Represented By: Hope A. Root
Represented By: Deja Dorothy Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?