Stafford v. Bojangles' Restaurants, Inc.
Plaintiff: Robert E Stafford, Jr.
Defendant: Bojangles' Restaurants, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00266
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2020 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM/BRIEF [in Support of] by Bojangles' Restaurants, Inc. re: #8 Motion to Dismiss (Church, Brian)
June 23, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Bojangles' Restaurants, Inc.. Responses due by 7/7/2020 (Church, Brian)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Bojangles' Restaurants, Inc. answer due 6/23/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 5/27/2020. (mek) Modified signature date on 6/1/2020 (rth).
May 28, 2020 Case reassigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney no longer assigned to the case due to conflict. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(thh)
May 27, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan Patrick Biffany on behalf of Bojangles' Restaurants, Inc. (Biffany, Brendan)
May 27, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bojangles' Restaurants, Inc. (Church, Brian)
May 27, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by Bojangles' Restaurants, Inc.. (Church, Brian). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
May 14, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Robert E Stafford, Jr. Bojangles' Restaurants, Inc. served on 5/11/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. (Gessner, L.)
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Bojangles' Restaurants, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (brj)
May 6, 2020 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (brj)
May 6, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4485052), filed by Robert E Stafford, Jr..(Gessner, L.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stafford v. Bojangles' Restaurants, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert E Stafford, Jr.
Represented By: L. Michelle Gessner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bojangles' Restaurants, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?