Ray v. Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc.
Plaintiff: Allen D. Ray, Jr.
Defendant: Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00327
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Robert J Conrad
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Filing 7 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hohnbaum, Cory)
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Allen D. Ray, Jr. Replies due by 8/7/2020 (Gordon, Andrew)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc.. Replies due by 7/31/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hohnbaum, Cory)
July 10, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Allen D. Ray, Jr. Responses due by 7/24/2020 (Gordon, Andrew). Motions referred to David Keesler.
June 17, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc.. Responses due by 7/1/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Brief in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Complaint, #2 Exhibit A)(Hohnbaum, Cory). Motions referred to David Keesler.
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc. (Hohnbaum, Cory)
June 10, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj)
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of Mecklenburg County, NC, case number 20CVS6747. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4527374), filed by Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint)(Hohnbaum, Cory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ray v. Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc.
Represented By: Cory Hohnbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen D. Ray, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?