Franklin v. City of Charlotte et al
Plaintiff: Ms. Deborah Franklin
Defendant: Wende Kerl and City of Charlotte
Case Number: 3:2020cv00330
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by City of Charlotte.(McCalman, Roger)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. City of Charlotte answer due 8/6/2020. Entered by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 7/6/2020. (Prichard, Daniel)
July 6, 2020 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by City of Charlotte. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McCalman, Roger)
June 24, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Deborah Franklin. Wende Kerl waiver sent on 6/16/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (Largess, S.)
June 15, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to City of Charlotte, Wende Kerl. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Wende Kerl)(mek)
June 11, 2020 Case assigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4529294), filed by Deborah Franklin.(Largess, S.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franklin v. City of Charlotte et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wende Kerl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Charlotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms. Deborah Franklin
Represented By: S. Luke Largess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?