Quesada et al v. Green Circle Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lorena Quesada and Gared Quesada
Defendant: Green Circle Solutions, Inc. and Alex Allison
Case Number: 3:2020cv00343
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 23:134
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alex Allison, Green Circle Solutions, Inc. (Clark, Thomas)
July 29, 2020 Filing 8 Consent CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Clark, Thomas)
July 13, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gared Quesada (Dressler, Brett)
July 9, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John Elliott Rogers, II on behalf of All Defendants (Rogers, John)
July 8, 2020 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 7/29/2020. (brj)
July 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Jonathan Clark on behalf of All Defendants (Clark, Thomas)
July 8, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Alex Allison, Green Circle Solutions, Inc..(Clark, Thomas)
July 2, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Reissued Electronically as to Green Circle Solutions, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(ams)
June 19, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Alex Allison, Green Circle Solutions, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons)(brj)
June 18, 2020 Case assigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(js)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4538562), filed by Lorena Quesada, Gared Quesada. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Dressler, Brett)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quesada et al v. Green Circle Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorena Quesada
Represented By: Brett E. Dressler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gared Quesada
Represented By: Brett E. Dressler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Circle Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Jonathan Clark
Represented By: John Elliott Rogers, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Allison
Represented By: Thomas Jonathan Clark
Represented By: John Elliott Rogers, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?