Total Petrochemicals and Refining USA, Inc. v. RSI Logistics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Total Petrochemicals and Refining USA, Inc.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: RSI Logistics, Inc. and RSI Leasing, Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: A&R Logistics, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00372
Filed: July 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by RSI Leasing, Inc., RSI Logistics, Inc.. A&R Logistics, Inc. served on 8/31/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hamilton, Meredith)
September 2, 2020 Filing 22 Surreply as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Total Petrochemicals and Refining USA, Inc.. (Reschly, Marla)
September 2, 2020 Filing 21 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by Total Petrochemicals and Refining USA, Inc.. Responses due by 9/16/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Proposed Surreply) (Reschly, Marla). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #21 Motion for Leave to File Sur-reply. Plaintiff shall file its sur-reply within five days of this Order. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 9/2/2020. (DLG)
August 31, 2020 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by RSI Leasing, Inc., RSI Logistics, Inc.. (Hamilton, Meredith)
August 26, 2020 Filing 19 Third Party Summons Issued Electronically as to A&R Logistics, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (clc)
August 24, 2020 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Total Petrochemicals and Refining USA, Inc.. Replies due by 8/31/2020 (Reschly, Marla)
August 24, 2020 Filing 17 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against A&R Logistics, Inc. with Jury Demand, filed by RSI Leasing, Inc., RSI Logistics, Inc..(Hamilton, Meredith)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Travis L. Brannon for Total Petrochemicals and Refining USA, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 8/19/2020. (brl)
August 19, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Travis L. Brannon Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4627528. by Total Petrochemicals and Refining USA, Inc.. (Reschly, Marla). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
August 19, 2020 Notice to Travis L. Brannon: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 8/26/2020. (brl)
August 10, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by RSI Leasing, Inc., RSI Logistics, Inc..(Wall, Frank)
August 10, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by RSI Leasing, Inc., RSI Logistics, Inc.. Responses due by 8/24/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Supporting Partial Motion To Dismiss) (Wall, Frank)
August 10, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Total Petrochemicals and Refining USA, Inc.. RSI Logistics, Inc. served on 7/20/2020, answer due 8/10/2020. (McClurg, Daniel)
August 10, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Total Petrochemicals and Refining USA, Inc.. RSI Leasing, Inc. served on 7/23/2020, answer due 8/13/2020. (McClurg, Daniel)
August 10, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith FitzGibbon Hamilton on behalf of All Defendants (Hamilton, Meredith)
August 10, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by RSI Leasing, Inc. (Wall, Frank)
August 10, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by RSI Logistics, Inc. (Wall, Frank)
August 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank Marshall Wall on behalf of RSI Leasing, Inc., RSI Logistics, Inc. (Wall, Frank)
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 Amended Corporate Disclosure Statement by Total Petrochemicals and Refining USA, Inc. (Reschly, Marla)
July 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Marla Tun Reschly on behalf of Total Petrochemicals and Refining USA, Inc. (Reschly, Marla)
July 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Drew McClurg on behalf of Total Petrochemicals and Refining USA, Inc. (McClurg, Daniel)
July 13, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to RSI Leasing, Inc., RSI Logistics, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons)(brj)
July 13, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Total Petrochemicals and Refining USA, Inc. (Reschly, Marla)
July 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RSI Leasing, Inc., RSI Logistics, Inc. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4570619), filed by Total Petrochemicals and Refining USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Reschly, Marla) Modified duplicate text on 7/13/2020 (brj).
July 13, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(js)
July 13, 2020 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (js)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Total Petrochemicals and Refining USA, Inc. v. RSI Logistics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: RSI Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Frank Marshall Wall
Represented By: Meredith FitzGibbon Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: RSI Leasing, Inc.
Represented By: Frank Marshall Wall
Represented By: Meredith FitzGibbon Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Total Petrochemicals and Refining USA, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Drew McClurg
Represented By: Marla Tun Reschly
Represented By: Travis L. Brannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: A&R Logistics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?