Neeser v. MAC Acquisition LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kristin Neeser
Defendant: MAC Acquisition LLC and Sullivan's Holding LLC doing business as Sullivan's Steakhouse
Case Number: 3:2020cv00389
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sullivan's Holding LLC (Nigh, Steven) (Main Document 11 replaced on 9/2/2020) (js). Modified to reflect correct attachment on 9/2/2020 (js). (Main Document 11 replaced on 9/3/2020) (eef).
August 31, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MAC Acquisition LLC (Nigh, Steven)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendants shall file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before September 14, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 8/20/20. (mga)
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint, by MAC Acquisition LLC, Sullivan's Holding LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Nigh, Steven). Motions referred to David Keesler.
August 6, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Kristin Neeser. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service on Defendant MAC Acquisition LLC, #2 Exhibit B - Proof of Service on Defendant Sullivan's Holding LLC)(Hernandez, Gilda)
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons -Mac Acquisition)(js)
July 16, 2020 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (js)
July 16, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(js)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Wesley Thayer Tucci on behalf of Kristin Neeser (Tucci, Robert)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Charlotte Claire Smith on behalf of Kristin Neeser (Smith, Charlotte)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Gilda Adriana Hernandez on behalf of Kristin Neeser (Hernandez, Gilda)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kristin Neeser (Hernandez, Gilda)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4577320), filed by Kristin Neeser. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Proposed Civil Summons - MAC Acquisition LLC, #3 Exhibit Proposed Civil Summons - Sullivan's Holding LLC, #4 Exhibit A - Notice and Consent to File Suit as Named Plaintiff)(Hernandez, Gilda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neeser v. MAC Acquisition LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAC Acquisition LLC
Represented By: Steven Andrew Nigh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sullivan's Holding LLC doing business as Sullivan's Steakhouse
Represented By: Steven Andrew Nigh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin Neeser
Represented By: Gilda Adriana Hernandez
Represented By: Robert Wesley Thayer Tucci
Represented By: Charlotte Claire Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?