Skanska USA Civil Southeast Inc. v. UP Community Fund, LLC
Plaintiff: Skanska USA Civil Southeast Inc.
Defendant: UP Community Fund, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00393
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Notice to Anna T. Birkenheier: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 8/10/2020. (brj)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Anna T. Birkenheier for Skanska USA Civil Southeast Inc. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 7/31/2020. (brj)
July 29, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Anna T. Birkenheier Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4595903. by Skanska USA Civil Southeast Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Laite, Gilbert)
July 28, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UP Community Fund, LLC (Burchette, Kathleen)
July 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen D.B. Burchette on behalf of UP Community Fund, LLC (Burchette, Kathleen)
July 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Parker Evans Moore on behalf of UP Community Fund, LLC (Moore, Parker)
July 28, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Skanska USA Civil Southeast Inc.. UP Community Fund, LLC waiver sent on 7/20/2020, answer due 9/18/2020. (Laite, Gilbert)
July 17, 2020 Case assigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (js)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Skanska USA Civil Southeast Inc. (Laite, Gilbert)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Gilbert Charles Laite, III on behalf of Skanska USA Civil Southeast Inc. (Laite, Gilbert)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Skanska USA Civil Southeast Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4578488), filed by Skanska USA Civil Southeast Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Irrevocable Letter of Credit, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Drawing, #3 Exhibit C - 7/2/20 Skanska Letter, #4 Cover Sheet)(Laite, Gilbert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skanska USA Civil Southeast Inc. v. UP Community Fund, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Skanska USA Civil Southeast Inc.
Represented By: Gilbert Charles Laite, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UP Community Fund, LLC
Represented By: Parker Evans Moore
Represented By: Kathleen D.B. Burchette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?