Data Driven Safety, LLC v. Health1Data, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Data Driven Safety, LLC
Defendant: Health1Consulting, LLC, Health1Data, LLC and Robert Joe Rayome, Jr.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00421
Filed: July 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
Presiding Judge: Robert J Conrad
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1836 (a) Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendants shall have up to and including October 5, 2020 to file a response to Plaintiff's Motion To File Redacted Complaint (Document No. 4) or otherwise respond to the Court's August 7, 2020 (Document No. 11). Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/1/20. (mga) (Main Document 24 replaced on 9/2/2020) (mga). NEF regenerated on 9/2/2020 (mga).
September 2, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Seal Redacted Complaint, a Redacted Memorandum in Support of the Motion for Preliminary Injunction, to File Exhibits Under Seal, and to File Subsequent Pleadings, Briefing, and Documents Under Seal.( Responses due by 10/5/2020 ), Set/Reset Deadlines: Court's Order dated August 7, 2020 (Document No. 11) ( Responses due by 10/5/2020 ) (mga)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #20 Defendants' Second Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Preliminary Injunction. Defendant shall have up to and including October 5, 2020 to file a response to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Document No. 5). Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/1/20. (mga)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #19 Defendants' Second Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendands Health1Consulting, LLC, Health1Data, LLC, and Robert Joe Rayome, Jr. shall have up to and including October 14, 2020 to file an Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintff's Verified Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/1/20. (mga)
September 1, 2020 Filing 21 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Motion to File Redacted Complaint, A Redacted Memorandum ISO Motion for Preliminary Injunction, to File Exhibits Under Seal, and to File Subsequent Pleadings, Briefings and Documents Under Seal by Health1Consulting, LLC, Health1Data, LLC, Robert Joe Rayome, Jr.. Responses due by 9/15/2020 (Coddington, Phoebe). Motions referred to David Keesler.
September 1, 2020 Filing 20 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Health1Consulting, LLC, Health1Data, LLC, Robert Joe Rayome, Jr.. Responses due by 9/15/2020 (Coddington, Phoebe). Motions referred to David Keesler.
September 1, 2020 Filing 19 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint,, by Health1Consulting, LLC, Health1Data, LLC, Robert Joe Rayome, Jr.. (Coddington, Phoebe). Motions referred to David Keesler.
September 1, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Responses due by 10/5/2020 (mga)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion to File Redacted Complaint. Defendants shall have up to and including September 3, 2020 to file an objection to Plaintiff's Motion to File Redacted Complaint (Document No. #4 ) and/or the Court's Order (Document No. #11 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 8/13/20. (mga)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Defendants shall have up to and including September 3, 2020 to file a response to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Document No. 5). Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 8/13/20. (mga)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendants shall have up to and including September 14, 2020 to answer or other wise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 8/13/20. (mga)
August 13, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Motion to File Redacted Complaint, A Redacted Memorandum ISO Motion for Preliminary Injunction, to File Exhibits Under Seal, and to File Subsequent Pleadings, Briefings and Documents Under Seal by Health1Consulting, LLC, Health1Data, LLC, Robert Joe Rayome, Jr.. Responses due by 8/27/2020 (Coddington, Phoebe). Motions referred to David Keesler.
August 13, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Health1Consulting, LLC, Health1Data, LLC, Robert Joe Rayome, Jr.. Responses due by 8/27/2020 (Coddington, Phoebe). Motions referred to David Keesler.
August 13, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint,, by Health1Consulting, LLC, Health1Data, LLC, Robert Joe Rayome, Jr.. (Coddington, Phoebe). Motions referred to David Keesler.
August 11, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Phoebe Norton Coddington on behalf of Health1Consulting, LLC, Health1Data, LLC, Robert Joe Rayome, Jr. (Coddington, Phoebe)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #4 Motion to Seal. Plaintiff's unredacted Complaint and its exhibits (Document No. 3) and the unredacted Memorandum in Support of the Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Document No. 6) shall remain under seal until otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 8/7/21. (mga)
August 6, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Data Driven Safety, LLC. Health1Data, LLC served on 8/3/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Stevenson, Colby)
August 6, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Data Driven Safety, LLC. Health1Consulting, LLC served on 8/3/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Stevenson, Colby)
August 6, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Data Driven Safety, LLC. Robert Joe Rayome, Jr. served on 8/3/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Stevenson, Colby)
July 30, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(js)
July 30, 2020 Filing 6 Unredacted Document (Sealed - Attorney) re #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction (available to Data Driven Safety, LLC, Health1Consulting, LLC, Health1Data, LLC, Robert Joe Rayome, Jr.) (Stevenson, Colby)
July 30, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Data Driven Safety, LLC. Responses due by 8/13/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Proposed Order) (Stevenson, Colby) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/30/2020) (mek).
July 30, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Seal Redacted Complaint, a Redacted Memorandum in Support of the Motion for Preliminary Injunction, to File Exhibits Under Seal, and to File Subsequent Pleadings, Briefing, and Documents Under Seal by Data Driven Safety, LLC. Responses due by 8/13/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Motion to File Redacted Complaint, a Redacted Memorandum in Support of the Motion for Preliminary Injunction, to File Exhibits Under Seal, and to File Subsequent Pleadings, Briefing, and Documents Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Stevenson, Colby) (mga).
July 30, 2020 Filing 3 Unredacted Document (Sealed - Attorney) re #1 Complaint,, (available to Data Driven Safety, LLC, Health1Consulting, LLC, Health1Data, LLC, Robert Joe Rayome, Jr.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MNDA - Health1Consulting, #2 Exhibit MNDA - Health1Data, #3 Exhibit Sales Services Agreement, #4 Exhibit MNDA - Praxis, #5 Exhibit Praxis Service Agreement, #6 Exhibit Praxis Tier Agreement, #7 Exhibit Praxis Termination Notification, #8 Exhibit Sales Services Agreement)(Stevenson, Colby) (Attachment 6 replaced on 8/13/2020) (tmg).
July 30, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Data Driven Safety, LLC (Stevenson, Colby)
July 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4596580), filed by Data Driven Safety, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MNDA - Health1Consulting, #2 Exhibit MNDA - Health1Data, #3 Exhibit Sales Services Agreement, #4 Exhibit MNDA - Praxis, #5 Exhibit Praxis Service Agreement, #6 Exhibit Praxis Tier Agreement, #7 Exhibit Praxis Termination Notification, #8 Exhibit Sales Services Agreement)(Stevenson, Colby)
July 30, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. Motions referred to David Keesler: #4 MOTION to Seal Redacted Complaint, a Redacted Memorandum in Support of the Motion for Preliminary Injunction, to File Exhibits Under Seal, and to File Subsequent Pleadings, Briefing, and Documents Under Seal, #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(js)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Data Driven Safety, LLC v. Health1Data, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health1Consulting, LLC
Represented By: Phoebe Norton Coddington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health1Data, LLC
Represented By: Phoebe Norton Coddington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Joe Rayome, Jr.
Represented By: Phoebe Norton Coddington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Data Driven Safety, LLC
Represented By: Colby Bourne Stevenson
Represented By: Brian Andrew Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?