Scott v. Watson et al
Plaintiff: Shalom Scott
Defendant: C. D. Watson and J. Caldwell
Case Number: 3:2020cv00457
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Issued Electronically to US Marshal for service as to C. D. Watson. (Attachments: #1 USM-285) (ejb)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that Pltf's #1 Complaint survives initial review under 28 U.S.C. 1915A and 1915(e) as to Pltf's claims against Deft Watson for violation of Pltf's substantive due process rights, gross negligence, excessive punishment, and deliberate indifference. Pltf's remaining claims fail initial review in accordance with the terms of this Order and are hereby dismissed; that all claims against Deft Caldwell are hereby DISMISSED. See 28 U.S.C. 1915A, 1915(e); that Pltf's #7 & #9 MOTIONS to Compel are hereby STRICKEN from the record in this matter; and the Clerk of Court is instructed to direct the U.S. Marshal to effectuate service upon Deft C.D. Watson with the summons filed at Docket Entry No. 1-2. Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 10/13/2020. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb)
October 13, 2020 Filing 10 Letter MOTION requesting the appointment of counsel by Shalom Scott. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (maf)
September 22, 2020 Filing 9 ***STRICKEN pursuant to #11 Order*** SECOND Pro Se MOTION to Compel Electronically Stored Information from Mecklenburg County Sheriff's Office by Shalom Scott. Responses due by 10/6/2020 (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (eef) Modified text on 10/14/2020 (ejb).
September 15, 2020 Filing 8 Prisoner Admin Remedy Statement by Shalom Scott (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(brj)
September 11, 2020 Filing 7 ***STRICKEN pursuant to #11 Order*** Pro Se MOTION to Compel Electronically Stored Information from Mecklenburg County Sheriff's Office by Shalom Scott. Responses due by 9/25/2020 (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (tlj) Modified text on 10/14/2020 (ejb).
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Waiving Initial Partial Filing Fee and Directing Monthly Payments be Made from Prison Account of SHALOM SCOTT. Directing correctional facility to transmit payments. Signed by the Clerk of Court on 09/08/2020. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (hms)
September 3, 2020 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (Sealed - Court) by Shalom Scott (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tlj)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Prisoner Trust Account Statement of Plaintiff. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(reh)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS mailed to Plaintiff re #1 Complaint (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(tlj)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT - 1983 Application IFP (Sealed - Participants) by Shalom Scott (tlj)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 Pro Se COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Shalom Scott. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Envelope)(tlj) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/18/2020: #4 Cover Letter) (tlj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Watson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. D. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shalom Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?