Benham v. City of Charlotte, North Carolina et al
Plaintiff: Philip Benham
Defendant: City of Charlotte, North Carolina and Jeffrey J Joseph
Case Number: 3:2020cv00459
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Philip Benham. Jeffrey J Joseph waiver sent on 9/23/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. (Kellum, Nathan)
October 7, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Robert Sullivan, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Sullivan, Benjamin)
September 23, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT Verified against All Defendants, filed by Philip Benham.(Kellum, Nathan)
September 14, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Philip Benham. City of Charlotte, North Carolina waiver sent on 9/8/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. (Kellum, Nathan)
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Philip Benham (Kellum, Nathan)
August 27, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Philip Benham. Responses due by 9/10/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Brief in Support) (Kellum, Nathan)
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan W. Kellum on behalf of Philip Benham (Kellum, Nathan)
August 21, 2020 Notice to Nathan W. Kellum: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 8/28/2020. (eef)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Nathan W. Kellum for Philip Benham. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 8/21/2020. (eef)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Reissued Electronically as to City of Charlotte, North Carolina. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. (brl)
August 19, 2020 Filing Fee Received: $ 400, receipt number CHD061224 (tlj)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Nathan W. Kellum Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4625804. by Philip Benham. (Redding, David)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to City of Charlotte, North Carolina, Jeffrey J Joseph. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons)(brj) Modified file date on 8/19/2020 (brl).
August 17, 2020 Case assigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Philip Benham. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Rhoades, Tyler)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benham v. City of Charlotte, North Carolina et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Charlotte, North Carolina
Represented By: Benjamin Robert Sullivan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey J Joseph
Represented By: Benjamin Robert Sullivan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Benham
Represented By: Tyler A. Rhoades
Represented By: David G. Redding
Represented By: Nathan W. Kellum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?