O'Neill v. Open Water Adventures Inc, et al
Plaintiff: Estate of Randolph O'Neill, Jane O'Neill, Liam O'Neill and Tara O'Neill
Defendant: Open Water Adventures Inc, Joseph Gaydeski, Dillon Matthewson and Heather Gaydeski
Case Number: 3:2020cv00476
Filed: August 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 46:761
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jane O'Neill. Dillon Matthewson waiver sent on 8/27/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Craig, Ronnie) Modified to correct service date on 10/14/2020 (js).
October 14, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jane O'Neill. Heather Gaydeski waiver sent on 8/27/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Craig, Ronnie) Modified to correct service date on 10/14/2020 (js).
October 14, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jane O'Neill. Joseph Gaydeski waiver sent on 8/27/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Craig, Ronnie) Modified to correct service date on 10/14/2020 (js).
September 30, 2020 Notice to Alton J. Hall, Jr.: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 10/7/2020. (brl)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Alton J. Hall, Jr20 for Jane O'Neill. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 9/30/2020. (brl)
September 30, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Alton J. Hall, Jr. Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4692900. by Jane O'Neill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Craig, Ronnie)
August 27, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Joseph Gaydeski. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (tlj)
August 27, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(js)
August 26, 2020 Case assigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(js)
August 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4640241), filed by Liam O'Neill.(Craig, Ronnie) Modified text on 9/8/2020 (rth).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Neill v. Open Water Adventures Inc, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Randolph O'Neill
Represented By: Ronnie Fred Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane O'Neill
Represented By: Ronnie Fred Craig
Represented By: Alton J. Hall, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liam O'Neill
Represented By: Ronnie Fred Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara O'Neill
Represented By: Ronnie Fred Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Open Water Adventures Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Gaydeski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dillon Matthewson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Gaydeski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?