Hensley v. City of Charlotte
Plaintiff: Johnathan S. Hensley
Defendant: City of Charlotte
Case Number: 3:2020cv00482
Filed: September 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Kenneth D Bell
Referring Judge: David S Cayer
2 Judge: Robert J Conrad
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 11/18/2020. (nvc)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by City of Charlotte.(Flanagan, Patrick)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Certificate of Settlement Conference Pursuant to Standing Order 5:19-mc-5. Result: Unable to resolve. (Flanagan, Patrick) Modified text on 10/28/2020 (nvc).
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting Defendants #12 Consent Motion to Set Aside Default. The Clerk's Entry of Default is set aside, and Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before 10/27/2020. Entered at the direction of District Judge Kenneth D. Bell on 10/13/2020. (nvc)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines: City of Charlotte answer due 10/27/2020. (nvc)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 Consent MOTION to Set Aside Default by City of Charlotte. (Flanagan, Patrick)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Consent MOTION to Set Aside Default by City of Charlotte. Responses due by 10/22/2020 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Lina James) (Flanagan, Patrick)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie H. Webster on behalf of City of Charlotte (Webster, Stephanie)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Houghton Flanagan on behalf of City of Charlotte (Flanagan, Patrick)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to City of Charlotte. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns (eef)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION for Entry of Default by Johnathan S. Hensley. (Stradley, J.)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Entry of Default by Johnathan S. Hensley. (Stradley, J.)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Johnathan S. Hensley. City of Charlotte served on 9/9/2020, answer due 9/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Delivery receipt)(Stradley, J.)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Case reassigned to District Judge Kenneth D. Bell. District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr no longer assigned to the case. Any pending hearings are cancelled. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(ttl)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John Francis Bloss, Sr on behalf of Johnathan S. Hensley (Bloss, John)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Drew Brown on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Brown, Drew)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick L. Berry on behalf of Johnathan S. Hensley (Berry, Frederick)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to City of Charlotte. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (js)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4648581), filed by Johnathan S. Hensley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cease-and-Desist Letter)(Stradley, J.)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(js)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hensley v. City of Charlotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnathan S. Hensley
Represented By: J. David Stradley
Represented By: Drew Brown
Represented By: John Francis Bloss, Sr.
Represented By: Frederick L. Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Charlotte
Represented By: Stephanie H. Webster
Represented By: Patrick Houghton Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?