Nyce v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Maria P Nyce
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 3:2020cv00512
Filed: September 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Life Insurance Company of North America's answer due 11/20/2020. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/28/2020. (DLG)
October 28, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Saluta, Gemma). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
October 28, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Gemma Lillian Saluta on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America (Saluta, Gemma)
September 17, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Life Insurance Company of North America. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (js) Modified date filed on 9/18/2020 (eef).
September 16, 2020 Case assigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(js)
September 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4671329), filed by Maria P Nyce.(Whitlow, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nyce v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Gemma Lillian Saluta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria P Nyce
Represented By: Robert A. Whitlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?