Schleehauf v. PCL Construction
Plaintiff: Schleehauf Erik and Erik Schleehauf
Defendant: PCL Construction
Case Number: 3:2020cv00515
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Robert J Conrad
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Filing 7 Pro Se MOTION for Default Judgment as to by Erik Schleehauf. Responses due by 11/27/2020 (tlj)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ROSEBORO ORDER Setting Response Deadline re: #4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Responses due by 11/20/2020. Failure to file a timely and persuasive response will likely lead to the dismissal of this lawsuit. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 11/3/20. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mga)
September 25, 2020 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by PCL Construction. (Rice, Akya)
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by PCL Construction. Responses due by 10/9/2020 (Rice, Akya). Motions referred to David Keesler.
September 18, 2020 Filing 3 Amended Corporate Disclosure Statement by PCL Construction (Rice, Akya)
September 18, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PCL Construction (Rice, Akya)
September 18, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(eef)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Mecklenburg, case number 20-CVS-8645. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4675623), filed by PCL Construction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Order Granting Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint, #4 Exhibit D- Declaration of Akya S. Rice, #5 Exhibit E - Notice of Filling of Notice of Removal)(Rice, Akya)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schleehauf v. PCL Construction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schleehauf Erik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik Schleehauf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PCL Construction
Represented By: Akya Shanelle Rice
Represented By: Benjamin Robert Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?