In re: Kaiser Gypsum Company Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Truck Insurance Exchange
Defendant: Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., Hanson Permanente Cement, Inc. and Lehigh Hanson, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00537
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Truck Insurance Exchange re #25 Response in Opposition, #26 Memorandum [Supplement to Prior COS] (Martinez, Michael)
November 4, 2020 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Truck Insurance Exchange re #25 Response in Opposition, #26 Memorandum (Martinez, Michael)
November 4, 2020 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM/BRIEF in Support of Truck's Objections to Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Truck Insurance Exchange re: #25 Response in Opposition (Martinez, Michael)
November 4, 2020 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 MOTION Order Recommending Entry of Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law and Order Confirming Joint Plan of Reorganization by Truck Insurance Exchange. (Martinez, Michael)
November 2, 2020 Notice to Robert Horkovich: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 11/9/2020. Please include Bankruptcy case number where you were granted Pro Hac Admission. (eef)
November 2, 2020 Notice to Mark Garbowski: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 11/9/2020. Please include Bankruptcy case number where you were granted Pro Hac Admission. (eef)
October 29, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance of Robert Horkovich and Mark Garbowski by Official Committee of Asbestos Personal Injury Claimants, et al. (Higgins, Sara) Modified text on 11/2/2020 (eef).
October 29, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell H. Falconer on behalf of Truck Insurance Exchange (Falconer, Russell)
October 29, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Rosenthal on behalf of Truck Insurance Exchange (Rosenthal, Michael)
October 29, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Glenn Bouslog on behalf of Truck Insurance Exchange (Bouslog, Matthew)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #4 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Concerning Forthcoming Briefs ( Responses due by 10/15/2020 ), MOTION Establish Briefing Schedule that Includes Reply Brief Deadline. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 10/28/2020. (eef)
October 28, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Thomas Houston on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., et al. (Houston, Andrew)
October 28, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Thomas Houston on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., et al. (Houston, Andrew)
October 28, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Thomas Houston on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., et al. (Houston, Andrew)
October 28, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert B. Krakow on behalf of Truck Insurance Exchange (Krakow, Robert)
October 28, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Thomas Houston on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., et al. (Houston, Andrew)
October 28, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Ronald Ghidina on behalf of Lehigh Hanson, Inc. (Ghidina, Douglas)
October 28, 2020 Minute Entry: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held before Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Attorney's on Call: C. Richard Rayburn, Jr., Gregory Gordon, John Miller, Jr., Paul Green, Ross Fulton, Amanda Rush, Felton Parrish, Douglas Ghidina, Sally Higgins. (eef)
October 27, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance of Caplin & Drysdale Attorneys admitted pro hac vice by Official Committee of Asbestos Personal Injury Claimants (Higgins, Sara)
October 27, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Wyche Higgins on behalf of Official Committee of Asbestos Personal Injury Claimants (Higgins, Sara)
October 22, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing of Affidavit of Service by Hanson Permanente Cement, Inc., Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc. re #6 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fulton, Ross)
October 21, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Rush on behalf of Hanson Permanente Cement, Inc., Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc. (Rush, Amanda)
October 20, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Edwin J. Harron on behalf of Lawrence Fitzpatrick (Harron, Edwin)
October 16, 2020 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Concerning Forthcoming Briefs MOTION Establish Briefing Schedule that Includes Reply Brief Deadline re #1 MOTION Order Recommending Entry of Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law and Order Confirming Joint Plan of Reorganization by Truck Insurance Exchange. (Martinez, Michael)
October 15, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Concerning Forthcoming Briefs MOTION Establish Briefing Schedule that Includes Reply Brief Deadline re #1 MOTION Order Recommending Entry of Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law and Order Confirming Joint Plan of Reorganization by Lawrence Fitzpatrick, Official Committee of Asbestos Personal Injury Claimants. Replies due by 10/22/2020 (Parrish, Felton)
October 15, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Concerning Forthcoming Briefs MOTION Establish Briefing Schedule that Includes Reply Brief Deadline re #1 MOTION Order Recommending Entry of Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law and Order Confirming Joint Plan of Reorganization by Hanson Permanente Cement, Inc., Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.. Replies due by 10/22/2020 (Fulton, Ross)
October 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Felton Parrish on behalf of Lawrence Fitzpatrick (Parrish, Felton)
October 1, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Concerning Forthcoming Briefs ( Responses due by 10/15/2020 ), MOTION Establish Briefing Schedule that Includes Reply Brief Deadline re #1 MOTION Order Recommending Entry of Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law and Order Confirming Joint Plan of Reorganization by Truck Insurance Exchange. (Martinez, Michael)
October 1, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Co-Counsel Appearance for Michael A. Rosenthal, Robert B. Krakow, Allyson N. Ho, Russell H. Falconer, Matthew G. Bouslog, and David W. Casazza, each of Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP by Truck Insurance Exchange re #2 Notice of Appearance (Martinez, Michael)
October 1, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L. Martinez on behalf of Truck Insurance Exchange (Martinez, Michael)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Order Recommending Entry of Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law and Order Confirming Joint Plan of Reorganization by United States Bankruptcy Judge J. Craig Whitley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Findings, #2 Proposed Confirmation Order) (thh) Modified text on 9/29/2020 (thh).
September 28, 2020 Notice to Paul M. Green: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 10/5/2020. (thh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Kaiser Gypsum Company Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory M. Gordon
Represented By: John R. Miller, Jr.
Represented By: Paul M. Green
Represented By: C. Richard Rayburn, Jr.
Represented By: Amanda Rush
Represented By: Ross Robert Fulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanson Permanente Cement, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory M. Gordon
Represented By: John R. Miller, Jr.
Represented By: Paul M. Green
Represented By: C. Richard Rayburn, Jr.
Represented By: Amanda Rush
Represented By: Ross Robert Fulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lehigh Hanson, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Ronald Ghidina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Truck Insurance Exchange
Represented By: Robert B. Krakow
Represented By: Russell H. Falconer
Represented By: Michael A. Rosenthal
Represented By: Matthew Glenn Bouslog
Represented By: Michael L. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?