Boger v. Saul
Plaintiff: Derrick Danyell Boger
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 3:2020cv00551
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney General, served on 10/30/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)(brl)
November 18, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Andrew Saul, served on 11/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)(brl)
November 18, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to United States Attorney served on 10/20/2020, answer due 12/21/2020. (brl)
October 16, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically to US Marshal for service as to Andrew M. Saul, US Attorney and US Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 USM285s)(brl)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Amended MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's counsel shall submit summonses within 7 days of entry of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 10/9/2020. (reh)
October 8, 2020 Filing 4 Amended MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Derrick Danyell Boger. (Bowling, Russell)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SEALED ORDER (Sealed - Participants) Plaintiff's #2 IFP Application is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff shall file an Amended Application within 30 days of entry of this Order. Failure to do so will result in the dismissal of this action without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 10/6/2020. (maf)
October 2, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge Martin Reidinger. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(tlj)
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Derrick Danyell Boger. (Bowling, Russell)
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, filed by Derrick Danyell Boger. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bowling, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boger v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Danyell Boger
Represented By: Russell R. Bowling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?