Kirk v. Davis et al
Plaintiff: Kareem Abdullah Kirk
Defendant: Jane Doe, City of Charlotte, William Todd Walther, County of Mecklenburg, Craig Stevenson Davis, April N. Phifer, Benjamin West, M. Williams, Krista Dodd and John Doe
Case Number: 3:2020cv00675
Filed: December 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ROSEBORO ORDER that Pltf shall have 30 days from entry of this Order to file a memorandum explaining why his Complaint is timely. (Pltf's Memorandum due by 2/18/2021.) If Pltf fails to comply, Complaint will likely be dismissed as time-barred without further notice. FURTHER ORDERED that Pltf may file a superseding Amended Response to the pending #10 Motion to Dismiss within 30 days from entry of this Order. (Pltf's Superseding Amended Responses due by 2/18/2021.) If Pltf fails to comply, Motion to Dismiss will likely be granted. FURTHER ORDERED that parties are instructed to refer to the victim by her initials and otherwise protect her identity from public disclosure in their future filings with the Court. The Clerk is instructed to redact the victim's name from documents that appear in CM-ECF and are otherwise available to the public. Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 1/18/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb)
January 12, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of intent not to file reply re #12 Response to Motion, #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by County of Mecklenburg. (Gibson, Ronald)
January 11, 2021 Filing 12 Pro Se RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Kareem Abdullah Kirk. Replies due by 1/19/2021 (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(js) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/11/2021: #2 Cover Letter) (js).
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Waiving Initial Partial Filing Fee and Directing Monthly Payments be Made from Prison Account of Kareem Abdullah Kirk. Directing correctional facility to transmit payments. Signed by the Clerk of Court on 12/22/2020. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(hms)
December 22, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by County of Mecklenburg. Responses due by 1/5/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Redacted Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit) (Gibson, Ronald) (Attachment 2 replaced on 1/20/2021 with redacted .pdf pursuant to #14 Roseboro Order.) (ejb).
December 22, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald L. Gibson on behalf of County of Mecklenburg (Gibson, Ronald)
December 21, 2020 Filing 8 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (Sealed - Court) submitted by NCDPS as to Kareem Abdullah Kirk (eef) Modified text on 12/23/2020 (ejb).
December 18, 2020 Filing 7 Prisoner Admin Remedy Statement by Kareem Abdullah Kirk (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(eef)
December 15, 2020 Filing 6 Pro Se NOTICE OF DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Kareem Abdullah Kirk (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ams)
December 15, 2020 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (Sealed - Court) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ams)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Prisoner Trust Account Statement of Plaintiff. Administrative Remedy Statement IS NOT Requested. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (hms)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by the Clerk of Court on 12/3/2020 re #1 Complaint (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(tlj)
December 3, 2020 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT - 1983 Application IFP (Sealed - Participants) re #1 Complaint by Kareem Abdullah Kirk (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tlj)
December 3, 2020 Filing 1 Pro Se COMPLAINT (redacted) against All Defendants, filed by Kareem Abdullah Kirk. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Redacted Exhibits, #3 Envelope)(tlj) (Main Document 1 and Attachment 2 replaced on 1/20/2021 with redacted .pdfs pursuant to #14 Roseboro Order, and modified text on 1/20/2021. (ejb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirk v. Davis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Charlotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Todd Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Mecklenburg
Represented By: Ronald L. Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Stevenson Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: April N. Phifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krista Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kareem Abdullah Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?