Silva v. Resurgent Capital Services L.P.
Plaintiff: Carlos Silva
Defendant: Resurgent Capital Services L.P.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00706
Filed: December 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2021 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 3/5/2021. (eef)
February 9, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Resurgent Capital Services L.P. (Grassi, David)
February 9, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Resurgent Capital Services L.P..(Grassi, David)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Resurgent Capital Services L.P. deadline to answer or otherwise response is 2/9/2021. Entered by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 2/2/2021. (KW)
February 1, 2021 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint, by Resurgent Capital Services L.P.. (Grassi, David)
January 13, 2021 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Carlos Silva. Resurgent Capital Services L.P. served on 1/12/2021, answer due 2/2/2021. (Emory, C.)
January 5, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Resurgent Capital Services L.P.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (tlj)
December 18, 2020 Case assigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(eef)
December 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Resurgent Capital Services L.P. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0419-4813012), filed by Carlos Silva. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet)(Emory, C.) Modified on 12/29/2020 to remove duplicate text (rth). (Attachment 2 replaced on 1/5/2021) (tlj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silva v. Resurgent Capital Services L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Silva
Represented By: C. Randolph Emory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resurgent Capital Services L.P.
Represented By: David Anthony Grassi, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?