Hayward Industries, Inc. v. BlueWorks Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Hayward Industries, Inc.
Defendant: BlueWorks Corporation, BlueWorks Innovation Corporation, Ningbo C.F. Electronic Tech Co., Ltd. and Ningbo Yishang Import and Export Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00710
Filed: December 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. BlueWorks Corporation, BlueWorks Innovation Corporation, Ningbo C.F. Electronic Tech Co., Ltd. and Ningbo Yishang Import and Export Co., Ltd. answer due 3/8/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 2/12/2021. (mek)
February 11, 2021 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint,, by BlueWorks Corporation, BlueWorks Innovation Corporation, Ningbo C.F. Electronic Tech Co., Ltd., Ningbo Yishang Import and Export Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Grimes, J.). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
January 25, 2021 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Hayward Industries, Inc.. Ningbo C.F. Electronic Tech Co., Ltd. served on 1/22/2021, answer due 2/12/2021; Ningbo Yishang Import and Export Co., Ltd. served on 1/22/2021, answer due 2/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email Service, #2 Exhibit B - Alibaba Submission, #3 Exhibit C - Blueworks Notification)(Ferguson, Russ)
January 22, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Clark Goodman on behalf of Hayward Industries, Inc. (Goodman, W.)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 for Alternative Service on Defendants based in People's Republic of China. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 1/22/21. (mek)
January 21, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Alternative Service on Defendants based in People's Republic of China by Hayward Industries, Inc.. Responses due by 2/4/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Alternative Service, #2 Affidavit Dinu Declaration and Exhibits, #3 Affidavit Belt Declaration, #4 Exhibit A to Belt Decl. - Cease & Desist Letter, #5 Exhibit B to Belt Decl. - Follow-Up Letter, #6 Exhibit C to Belt Decl. - Ningo "Contact Us" Page, #7 Exhibit D to Belt Decl. - Alibaba Contact Page, #8 Exhibit E to Belt Decl. - Theragun v. Golovan, #9 Exhibit F to Belt Decl. - Chanel v. Chanelbags.ru, #10 Exhibit G to Belt Decl. - Agilent v. J&X, #11 Exhibit H to Belt Decl. - Chanel v. ReplicasChanel.com, #12 Exhibit I to Belt Decl. - TV Ears v. Joyshiya) (Ferguson, Russ). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Erik Paul Belt for Hayward Industries, Inc.; granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Anne E. Shannon for Hayward Industries, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 1/13/21. (mek)
January 13, 2021 Notice to Erik Paul Belt: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 1/20/2021. (mek)
January 13, 2021 Notice to Anne E. Shannon: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 1/20/2021. (mek)
December 29, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Hayward Industries, Inc.. BlueWorks Innovation Corporation served on 12/29/2020, answer due 1/19/2021. (Ferguson, Russ)
December 29, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Hayward Industries, Inc.. BlueWorks Corporation served on 12/29/2020, answer due 1/19/2021. (Ferguson, Russ)
December 21, 2020 Filing 6 REPORT on the Filing of an action regarding patent and/or trademark numbers contained in complaint. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (eef)
December 21, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to BlueWorks Corporation, BlueWorks Innovation Corporation, Ningbo C.F. Electronic Tech Co., Ltd., Ningbo Yishang Import and Export Co., Ltd.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(eef)
December 21, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. Motions referred to David S. Cayer: #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Erik Paul Belt Filing fee $ 288, receipt number 0419-4815299., #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Anne E. Shannon Filing fee $ 288, receipt number 0419-4815303. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(eef)
December 21, 2020 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (eef)
December 18, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Anne E. Shannon Filing fee $ 288, receipt number 0419-4815303. by Hayward Industries, Inc.. (Ferguson, Russ)
December 18, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Erik Paul Belt Filing fee $ 288, receipt number 0419-4815299. by Hayward Industries, Inc.. (Ferguson, Russ)
December 18, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hayward Industries, Inc. (Ferguson, Russ)
December 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BlueWorks Corporation, BlueWorks Innovation Corporation, Ningbo C.F. Electronic Tech Co., Ltd., Ningbo Yishang Import and Export Co., Ltd. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0419-4815283), filed by Hayward Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Trademark Registration Certificates, #2 Exhibit B - TurboCells Expert Line Sell Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - May 12, 2020 Letter to BlueWorks Defendants, #4 Exhibit D - June 25, 2020 Letter to BlueWorks Defendants)(Ferguson, Russ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hayward Industries, Inc. v. BlueWorks Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BlueWorks Corporation
Represented By: J. Douglas Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BlueWorks Innovation Corporation
Represented By: J. Douglas Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ningbo C.F. Electronic Tech Co., Ltd.
Represented By: J. Douglas Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ningbo Yishang Import and Export Co., Ltd.
Represented By: J. Douglas Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hayward Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Russ Ferguson
Represented By: W. Clark Goodman
Represented By: Erik Paul Belt
Represented By: Anne E. Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?