Otis v. City of Mount Holly et. al
Plaintiff: Africa E Otis and Africa E. Otis
Defendant: Miles Braswell, Donald Roper, City of Mount Holly and Danny Jackson
Case Number: 3:2020cv00737
Filed: December 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441cv
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint in #1 Notice of Removal,, with Jury Demand by Miles Braswell, City of Mount Holly, Danny Jackson, Donald Roper. (Flanagan, Patrick)
February 1, 2021 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 2/22/2021. (eef)
January 27, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Miles Braswell, City of Mount Holly, Danny Jackson, Donald Roper.(Flanagan, Patrick)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. All Defendants.. Entered by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on January 4, 2021. (DC)
January 4, 2021 Case assigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(tlj)
December 31, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint by Miles Braswell, City of Mount Holly, Danny Jackson, Donald Roper. (Flanagan, Patrick)
December 31, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Gaston County Superior Court, case number 20 CVS 4133. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0419-4830883), filed by City of Mount Holly, Miles Braswell, Donald Roper, Danny Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Flanagan, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Otis v. City of Mount Holly et. al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miles Braswell
Represented By: Patrick Houghton Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Roper
Represented By: Patrick Houghton Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Mount Holly
Represented By: Patrick Houghton Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Jackson
Represented By: Patrick Houghton Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Africa E Otis
Represented By: Eric Albert Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Africa E. Otis
Represented By: Eric Albert Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?