Carpenter v. William Douglas Management, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Susan K Carpenter and Susan K. Carpenter
Defendant: William Douglas Management, Inc., Nextlevel Association Solutions, Inc. and NextLevel Association Solutions, Inc. doing business as HomeWiseDocs.com
Case Number: 3:2021cv00019
Filed: January 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Robert J Conrad
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2021 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Dismiss , #13 MOTION to Dismiss by Susan K. Carpenter. Replies due by 3/17/2021 (Harris, Scott)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Defendant NextLevel Association Solutions, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. The sur-reply brief of five (5) pages or less, on or before March 15, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/10/21. (mga) Modified judge on 3/10/2021 (mga).
March 10, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #19 MOTION to Remand to State Court . Sur-Reply due by 3/15/2021 (mga)
March 9, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by NextLevel Association Solutions, Inc.. Responses due by 3/23/2021 (Oliss, Philip). Motions referred to David Keesler.
March 8, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick M. Wallace on behalf of Susan K. Carpenter (Wallace, Patrick)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Plaintiff to File A Consolidated Response To Defendants" Motion To Dismiss With Increased Pages, And Extension Of Time For Defendant Replies. Plaintiff may file a consolidated response to Defendants pending motions to dismiss (Document Nos. 13 and 15), not to exceed thirty (30) pages, on or before March 10, 2021; Defendants shall file reply briefs in support of their motions to dismiss on or before March 31, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/8/21. (mga)
March 8, 2021 Filing 23 Joint MOTION re #15 MOTION to Dismiss , #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Plaintiff to File a Consolidated Response to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss with Increased Pages, and Extension of Time for Defendants' Replies by Susan K. Carpenter. Responses due by 3/22/2021 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Harris, Scott). Motions referred to David Keesler.
March 8, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss , #15 MOTION to Dismiss . Responses due by 3/10/2021 Replies due by 3/31/2021 (mga)
March 5, 2021 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 MOTION to Remand to State Court In Support of Motion by Susan K. Carpenter. (Harris, Scott)
February 26, 2021 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Remand to State Court by NextLevel Association Solutions, Inc.. Replies due by 3/5/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Oliss, Philip)
February 12, 2021 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support re #19 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Susan K. Carpenter. (Harris, Scott)
February 12, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Susan K. Carpenter. Responses due by 2/26/2021 (Harris, Scott). Motions referred to David Keesler.
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion For Extension Of Time To Respond To Defendants Two Motions To Dismiss #13 . Plaintiff shall file responses to the pending motions to dismiss (Document Nos. #13 and #15 ), or in the alternative file an Amended Complaint pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 15, on or before March 10, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/10/21. (mga)
February 10, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #15 MOTION to Dismiss , #13 MOTION to Dismiss by Susan K. Carpenter. Responses due by 2/24/2021 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Williams, Jeremy). Motions referred to David Keesler.
February 3, 2021 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION to Dismiss by NextLevel Association Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Oliss, Philip)
February 3, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by NextLevel Association Solutions, Inc.. Responses due by 2/17/2021 (Oliss, Philip). Motions referred to David Keesler.
February 3, 2021 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss by William Douglas Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Cedar Management Group, LLC's Brief in Support Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 2 - General Assembly of North Carolina Session 2019)(Kuykendal, Jeffrey)
February 3, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss by William Douglas Management, Inc.. Responses due by 2/17/2021 (Kuykendal, Jeffrey). Motions referred to David Keesler.
January 19, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Walton Prunka on behalf of Nextlevel Association Solutions, Inc. (Prunka, Alexander)
January 19, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip M. Oliss on behalf of Nextlevel Association Solutions, Inc. (Oliss, Philip)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Alexander W. Prunka is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Defendant Nextlevel Association Solutions, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/15/21. (mga)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Phillip M. Oliss is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Defendant Nextlevel Association Solutions, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/15/21. (mga)
January 15, 2021 Notice to Alexander W. Prunka: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 1/22/2021. (mga)
January 15, 2021 Notice to Phillip M. Oliss: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 1/22/2021. (mga)
January 14, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Alexander W. Prunka Filing fee $ 288, receipt number 0419-4850793. by Nextlevel Association Solutions, Inc.. (Thurman, Frederick). Motions referred to David Keesler.
January 14, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Philip M. Oliss Filing fee $ 288, receipt number 0419-4850792. by Nextlevel Association Solutions, Inc.. (Thurman, Frederick). Motions referred to David Keesler.
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal. Defendants shall file Answers, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before February 3, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/14/21. (mga)
January 14, 2021 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer for Both Defendants by Nextlevel Association Solutions, Inc.. (Thurman, Frederick). Motions referred to David Keesler.
January 14, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Ari Meckler on behalf of Nextlevel Association Solutions, Inc. (Meckler, Steven)
January 14, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick M. Thurman, Jr on behalf of Nextlevel Association Solutions, Inc. (Thurman, Frederick)
January 14, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(tlj)
January 13, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nextlevel Association Solutions, Inc. (Thurman, Frederick)
January 13, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Mecklenburg County Superior Court, case number 20 CVS 8415. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0419-4848263), filed by Nextlevel Association Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Thurman, Frederick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carpenter v. William Douglas Management, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Douglas Management, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Brandt Kuykendal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nextlevel Association Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Frederick M. Thurman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NextLevel Association Solutions, Inc. doing business as HomeWiseDocs.com
Represented By: Frederick M. Thurman, Jr.
Represented By: Steven Ari Meckler
Represented By: Philip M. Oliss
Represented By: Alexander Walton Prunka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan K Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan K. Carpenter
Represented By: Patrick M. Wallace
Represented By: Jeremy R. Williams
Represented By: Scott Crissman Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?