Stephenson v. Carolinas Physicians Network, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Courtney Stephenson and Courtney D. Stephenson
Defendant: Atrium Health, Inc., The Charlotte-Mecklenburg Hospital Authority, Carolinas Physicians Network and Carolinas Physicians Network, Inc. doing business as Carolinas Healthcare System Medical Group
Case Number: 3:2021cv00103
Filed: March 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Courtney D. Stephenson. Carolinas Physicians Network, Inc. waiver sent on 3/11/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Avram, Andrew)
April 12, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Courtney D. Stephenson. The Charlotte-Mecklenburg Hospital Authority waiver sent on 3/11/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Avram, Andrew)
April 12, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Courtney D. Stephenson. Atrium Health, Inc. waiver sent on 3/11/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Avram, Andrew)
March 12, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to The Charlotte-Mecklenburg Hospital Authority on 03/11/2021 by Courtney D. Stephenson. (Edwards, Catharine)
March 12, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Atrium Health, Inc. on 03/11/2021 by Courtney D. Stephenson. (Edwards, Catharine)
March 12, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Carolina Physicians Network, Inc. on 03/11/2021 by Courtney D. Stephenson. (Edwards, Catharine)
March 12, 2021 Case assigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(tlj)
March 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4935802), filed by Courtney D. Stephenson. (Edwards, Catharine) Modified on 3/12/2021 to add middle initial (tlj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stephenson v. Carolinas Physicians Network, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atrium Health, Inc.
Represented By: Kerry A. Shad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Charlotte-Mecklenburg Hospital Authority
Represented By: Kerry A. Shad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolinas Physicians Network
Represented By: Kerry A. Shad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolinas Physicians Network, Inc. doing business as Carolinas Healthcare System Medical Group
Represented By: Kerry A. Shad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Stephenson
Represented By: Catharine E. Edwards
Represented By: Mary Kathryn Kurth
Represented By: Andrew C. Avram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney D. Stephenson
Represented By: Catharine E. Edwards
Represented By: Mary Kathryn Kurth
Represented By: Andrew C. Avram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?