Hollis et al v. Valley Proteins Inc.
Plaintiff: Herman Purvis, Veraka Sturdivant and Christopher Hollis
Defendant: Valley Proteins Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00112
Filed: March 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2021 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 5 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 5/24/2021. (clc)
April 29, 2021 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Valley Proteins Inc. (Henson, Andrew)
April 29, 2021 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Valley Proteins Inc..(Henson, Andrew)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Ashley Z. Hager for Valley Proteins Inc. and granting #21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Emily E. Schifter for Valley Proteins Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Attorneys served via NEF). Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 4/27/2021. (mek)
April 27, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Emily E. Schifter Filing fee $ 288, receipt number 0419-5003449. by Valley Proteins Inc.. (Henson, Andrew). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
April 27, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Ashley Z. Hager Filing fee $ 288, receipt number 0419-5003398. by Valley Proteins Inc.. (Henson, Andrew). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
April 27, 2021 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Valley Proteins Inc.. Responses due by 5/11/2021 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Henson, Andrew). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #17 Amended MOTION to Certify Class Conditionally as a Collective Action and for a Court-Authorized Notice to be Issued Under Section 216(b) of the Fair Labor Standards Act. Responses due by 5/25/2021. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 4/27/2021. (DLG)
April 27, 2021 Notice to Ashley Z. Hager: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF Account #Application Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 5/4/2021. (mek)
April 27, 2021 Notice to Emily E. Schifter: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF Account #Application Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 5/4/2021. (mek)
April 23, 2021 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support re #17 Amended MOTION to Certify Class Conditionally as a Collective Action and for a Court-Authorized Notice to be Issued Under Section 216(b) of the Fair Labor Standards Act by Christopher Hollis, Herman Purvis, Veraka Sturdivant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Christopher Hollis, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Herman Purvis, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Veraka Sturdivant, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Justin Cofield, #5 Exhibit E - Declaration of Rodney Johnson, #6 Exhibit F - Declaration of Nelson Johnson, #7 Exhibit G - Proposed Notice, #8 Exhibit H - Opt In Form)(Hernandez, Gilda)
April 23, 2021 Filing 17 Amended MOTION to Certify Class Conditionally as a Collective Action and for a Court-Authorized Notice to be Issued Under Section 216(b) of the Fair Labor Standards Act by Christopher Hollis, Herman Purvis, Veraka Sturdivant. Responses due by 5/7/2021 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hernandez, Gilda)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER denying #16 Motion to Exceed Word Limit. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 4/23/2021. (DLG)
April 22, 2021 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION re #15 Memorandum in Support of Motion,, for Leave to Exceed Word Count in by Christopher Hollis, Herman Purvis, Veraka Sturdivant. Responses due by 5/6/2021 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hernandez, Gilda). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
April 20, 2021 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 MOTION to Certify Class Conditionally as a Collective Action and for a Court-Authorized Notice to be Issued Under Section 216(b) of the Fair Labor Standards Act by Christopher Hollis, Herman Purvis, Veraka Sturdivant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Christopher Hollis, #2 Exhibit B- Declaration of Herman Purvis, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Veraka Sturdivant, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Justin Cofield, #5 Exhibit E - Declaration of Rodney Johnson, #6 Exhibit F - Declaration of Nelson Johnson, #7 Exhibit G - Proposed Notice, #8 Exhibit H - Opt In Form)(Hernandez, Gilda)
April 20, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Certify Class Conditionally as a Collective Action and for a Court-Authorized Notice to be Issued Under Section 216(b) of the Fair Labor Standards Act by Christopher Hollis, Herman Purvis, Veraka Sturdivant. Responses due by 5/4/2021 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hernandez, Gilda)
April 16, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing of Consents to Join Suit as Party Plaintiffs by Christopher Hollis, Herman Purvis, Veraka Sturdivant (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consents to Join Suit 1-6)(Hernandez, Gilda)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Valley Proteins Inc. answer due 4/29/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 4/13/2021. (mek)
April 13, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Henson on behalf of Valley Proteins Inc. (Henson, Andrew)
April 13, 2021 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint,, by Valley Proteins Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Henson, Andrew). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
April 6, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing of Consents to Join Suit as Party Plaintiffs by Christopher Hollis, Herman Purvis, Veraka Sturdivant (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consents to Join Suit 1-8)(Hernandez, Gilda)
March 26, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Christopher Hollis, Veraka Sturdivant, Herman Purvis. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service of Summons on Defendant)(Hernandez, Gilda)
March 19, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued Electronically as to Valley Proteins Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (js)
March 19, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Charlotte Claire Smith on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Smith, Charlotte)
March 19, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Veraka Sturdivant (Hernandez, Gilda)
March 19, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Herman Purvis (Hernandez, Gilda)
March 19, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Christopher Hollis (Hernandez, Gilda)
March 19, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Gilda Adriana Hernandez on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hernandez, Gilda)
March 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0419-4948545), filed by Christopher Hollis, Veraka Sturdivant, Herman Purvis. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit A - Notice of Filing of Consent to File Suit as Named Plaintiff - Christopher Hollis, #4 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing of Consent to File Suit as Named Plaintiff - Herman Purvis, #5 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing of Consent to File Suit as Named Plaintiff - Veraka Sturdivant)(Hernandez, Gilda)
March 19, 2021 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (js)
March 19, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(js)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hollis et al v. Valley Proteins Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herman Purvis
Represented By: Gilda Adriana Hernandez
Represented By: Charlotte Claire Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veraka Sturdivant
Represented By: Gilda Adriana Hernandez
Represented By: Charlotte Claire Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Hollis
Represented By: Gilda Adriana Hernandez
Represented By: Charlotte Claire Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valley Proteins Inc.
Represented By: Andrew J. Henson
Represented By: Ashley Zeiler Hager
Represented By: Emily Evans Schifter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?