We CBD, LLC v. The United States of America et al
Plaintiff: We CBD, LLC
Defendant: US Customs and Border Protection, The United States of America and U.S. Customs and Border Protection
Case Number: 3:2021cv00115
Filed: March 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying as moot #4 Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction. The Court hereby terminates the hearing set for Tuesday, March 30, 2021. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 3/29/21. (clc)
March 28, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Disposition of Seized Property at Issue by The United States of America, U.S. Customs and Border Protection re #5 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, (Johnson, J.)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order : Motion Hearing set for 3/30/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2-1, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Frank D. Whitney. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 3/25/21. (clc)
March 24, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by We CBD, LLC. Responses due by 4/7/2021 (Terpening, William)
March 24, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE sua sponte following initial review of the Verified Complaint that pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(c), motions contained in an initial pleading like a Complaint are considered by the Court to be preserved. However, a party wishing the court rule on a motion contained in the Complaint shall file a separate motion and supporting brief filed contemporaneously with the motion. (clc)
March 22, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to The United States of America, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, and US Attorney General. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(tlj)
March 22, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(tlj)
March 22, 2021 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (tlj)
March 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The United States of America, US Customs and Border Protection with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0419-4949399), filed by We CBD, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Terpening, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: We CBD, LLC v. The United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: We CBD, LLC
Represented By: William R. Terpening
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Customs and Border Protection
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Represented By: J. Seth Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Customs and Border Protection
Represented By: J. Seth Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?