Spikes v. USA
Petitioner: Denzel Lamont Spikes
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 3:2021cv00128
Filed: March 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2021 Filing 5 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 4/26/2021. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER dismissing with prejudice and denying Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255). Court declines to issue a Certificate of Appealability. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 4/26/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb)
April 16, 2021 Filing 3 Pro Se RESPONSE to Order to Show Cause re #2 Order Setting Response Deadline, by Denzel Lamont Spikes. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(js)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Setting Response Deadline. Petitioner shall file a Response within fourteen (14) days from entry of this Order which explains why his 2255 Motion to Vacate is timely. Failure to comply with this Order will probably result in the dismissal of the 2255 Motion to Vacate with prejudice as time-barred. Responses due by 4/16/2021. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 3/31/21. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(clc)
March 30, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(js)
March 30, 2021 Filing 1 Pro Se MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) re: Criminal Case No. 3:17-cr-00134-FDW-DSC-71 ( USA2255Group added.), filed by Denzel Lamont Spikes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(js)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spikes v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Denzel Lamont Spikes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?