Davis v. Scarborough et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Davis
Defendant: Rocky Lutz and Shante Scarborough
Case Number: 3:2021cv00132
Filed: March 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2021 Filing 7 Prisoner Admin Remedy Statement by Kenneth Davis (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(js)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Waiving Initial Partial Filing Fee and Directing Monthly Payments be Made from Prison Account of Kenneth Davis. Directing correctional facility to transmit payments. Signed by the Clerk of Court on 04/21/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (hms)
April 19, 2021 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (Sealed - Court) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(js)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Prisoner Trust Account Statement of Plaintiff. Signed by Clerk of Court on 4/7/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (rhf)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Clerk of Court on 4/7/2021 (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (rhf) Modified text on 4/7/2021 (rhf).
March 30, 2021 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT - 1983 Application IFP (Sealed - Participants) re #1 Complaint by Kenneth Davis (Attachments: #1 Pro Se Financial Statement, #2 Envelope)(eef)
March 30, 2021 Filing 1 Pro Se COMPLAINT against Rocky Lutz, Shante Scarborough, filed by Kenneth Davis. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Pro Se Proposed Order, #3 Envelope)(eef)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Scarborough et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rocky Lutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shante Scarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?