Urban et al v. Deli Management, Inc.
Plaintiff: Matthew Urban and Van Warner
Defendant: Deli Management, Inc. doing business as Jason's Deli
Case Number: 3:2021cv00209
Filed: May 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 206
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan: Estimated Trial Time: 5 days. Discovery due by 12/15/2021. Motions due by 1/12/2022. Mediation deadline set for 12/29/2021. Jury Trial set for 5/2/2022 09:01 AM in Courtroom #5B, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Frank D. Whitney.. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 6/16/21. (clc)
June 11, 2021 Filing 15 CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Gardner, Jared)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Christopher Michael Timmel for Matthew Urban,Christopher Michael Timmel for Van Warner. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 6/10/21. (mga)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Seth R. Lesser for Matthew Urban,Seth R. Lesser for Van Warner. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 6/20/21. (mga)
June 9, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Christopher M. Timmel Filing fee $ 288, receipt number 0419-5068370. by Matthew Urban, Van Warner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Timmel Bar Admissions) (Gibbons, Philip). Motions referred to David Keesler.
June 9, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Seth R. Lesser Filing fee $ 288, receipt number 0419-5068356. by Matthew Urban, Van Warner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Lesser Bar Admissions) (Gibbons, Philip). Motions referred to David Keesler. Modified docket text on 6/10/2021 (tlj).
June 8, 2021 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 5 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 6/28/2021. (brl)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Meaghan K. Maus for Deli Management, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 6/4/21. (mga)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Christopher M. Bentley for Deli Management, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 6/4/21. (mga) Modified entry date on 6/7/2021 (mga).
June 7, 2021 Notice to Meaghan K. Maus: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 6/14/2021. (mga)
June 7, 2021 Notice to Christopher M. Bentley: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF Account #Application Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 6/14/2021. (mga)
June 4, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Meaghan K. Maus Filing fee $ 288, receipt number 0419-5063270. by Deli Management, Inc.. (Gardner, Jared). Motions referred to David Keesler.
June 4, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Christopher M. Bentley Filing fee $ 288, receipt number 0419-5063253. by Deli Management, Inc.. (Gardner, Jared). Motions referred to David Keesler.
May 28, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Deli Management, Inc. (Gardner, Jared)
May 28, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Deli Management, Inc..(Gardner, Jared)
May 17, 2021 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Matthew Urban, Van Warner. Deli Management, Inc. served on 5/7/2021, answer due 5/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service)(Gibbons, Philip)
May 5, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Deli Management, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (tlj)
May 5, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(tlj)
May 5, 2021 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (tlj)
May 4, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Corey Michael Stanton on behalf of Matthew Urban, Van Warner (Stanton, Corey)
May 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Deli Management, Inc. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0419-5015508), filed by Matthew Urban, Van Warner.(Gibbons, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Urban et al v. Deli Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Urban
Represented By: Philip J. Gibbons, Jr
Represented By: Corey Michael Stanton
Represented By: Seth R. Lesser
Represented By: Christopher Michael Timmel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Van Warner
Represented By: Philip J. Gibbons, Jr
Represented By: Corey Michael Stanton
Represented By: Seth R. Lesser
Represented By: Christopher Michael Timmel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deli Management, Inc. doing business as Jason's Deli
Represented By: Christopher M. Bentley
Represented By: Meaghan K. Maus
Represented By: Jared E. Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?