Slafka et al v. Reece et al
Plaintiff: David Carr and Michael Slafka
Defendant: Robert D. Freeman, G. Bruce Turner, Kristen Mullinax, Kuester Management Group, LLC, Bethany Totherow, Cynthia Jones, William Douglas Management, Inc., Ahn Law Firm, LLC, Pamela L. Harrington, Thomas F. Reece, Thomas V. Bennett, Phil Henderson, Henderson Properties, Inc., Robert M. Johns, Jr., Sellers, Ayers, Dortch & Lyons, P.A., Laura Miller, Chan M. Ahn, Capital Exteriors & Renovations, LLC, Paul H. Vandiver, Jr., Fairway Townes Owner's Association, Inc., Dean and Fairway Townes Owners' Association, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00217
Filed: May 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Referring Judge: Graham Mullen
2 Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2021 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Compel MOTION for Extension of Time for Service of Process MOTION to Strike #9 MOTION to Dismiss , #7 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Sanctions and others by Fairway Townes Owners' Association, Inc.. Replies due by 7/15/2021 (Raynor, Kenneth)
July 8, 2021 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Kenneth R. Raynor by Fairway Townes Owners' Association, Inc. (Raynor, Kenneth)
July 1, 2021 Filing 12 Summons Reissued Conventionally as to All Defendants by U.S. Mail. (eef)
June 30, 2021 Filing 11 Pro Se MOTION to Compel ( Responses due by 7/14/2021 ), MOTION for Extension of Time for Service of Process, MOTION to Strike #9 MOTION to Dismiss , #7 MOTION to Dismiss ( Responses due by 7/14/2021 ), MOTION for Sanctions ( Responses due by 7/14/2021 ) by David Carr, Michael Slafka. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Envelope) (eef). Motions referred to David Keesler.
June 29, 2021 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss by Fairway Townes Owners' Association, Inc.. (Raynor, Kenneth)
June 29, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Fairway Townes Owners' Association, Inc.. Responses due by 7/13/2021 (Raynor, Kenneth)
June 16, 2021 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss by Henderson Properties, Inc.. (Raynor, Kenneth)
June 16, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Henderson Properties, Inc.. Responses due by 6/30/2021 (Raynor, Kenneth)
June 14, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Reissued Electronically as to David Carr. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(tlj)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Fairway Townes Owners' Association, Inc. answer due 7/2/2021; Henderson Properties, Inc. answer due 7/2/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 6/1/21. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mga)
June 1, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Fairway Townes Owners' Association, Inc., Henderson Properties, Inc.. (Raynor, Kenneth). Motions referred to David Keesler.
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Senior Judge Graham Mullen recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David Keesler for all further proceedings. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 5/19/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
May 11, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued Conventionally as to All Defendants. (tlj)
May 11, 2021 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Case Assignment Packet. The document was served conventionally by US Mail (tlj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slafka et al v. Reece et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert D. Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Bruce Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristen Mullinax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kuester Management Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bethany Totherow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Douglas Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ahn Law Firm, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela L. Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas F. Reece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas V. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phil Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henderson Properties, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth R. Raynor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert M. Johns, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sellers, Ayers, Dortch & Lyons, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chan M. Ahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital Exteriors & Renovations, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul H. Vandiver, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairway Townes Owner's Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairway Townes Owners' Association, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth R. Raynor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Slafka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?