Hathaway v. Smallcakes Steele Creek, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Angela Hathaway
Defendant: Smallcakes Ballantyne, LLC, Ian Bowleg, Smallcakes Steele Creek, LLC and Ayanna Bowleg
Case Number: 3:2021cv00290
Filed: June 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Joint CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Haynes, Nicole)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 5 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 8/3/2021. (clc)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Smallcakes Ballantyne, LLC (Jenkins, Amy)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Smallcakes Steele Creek, LLC (Jenkins, Amy)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Ayanna Bowleg, Ian Bowleg, Smallcakes Ballantyne, LLC, Smallcakes Steele Creek, LLC.(Jenkins, Amy)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Yager Jenkins on behalf of All Defendants (Jenkins, Amy)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Katherine Haynes on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Haynes, Nicole)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Reissued Electronically as to Ayanna Bowleg, Ian Bowleg. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(js)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (js)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Case assigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(js)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (js)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0419-5079165), filed by Angela Hathaway. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Hathaway Consent to Join)(Gessner, L.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hathaway v. Smallcakes Steele Creek, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smallcakes Ballantyne, LLC
Represented By: Amy Yager Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ian Bowleg
Represented By: Amy Yager Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smallcakes Steele Creek, LLC
Represented By: Amy Yager Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ayanna Bowleg
Represented By: Amy Yager Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Hathaway
Represented By: L. Michelle Gessner
Represented By: Nicole Katherine Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?