Brice v. Marlowe et al
Plaintiff: Romeal Brice
Defendant: Gaston County Sheriff's Department, FNU Marlowe and Alan Cloninger
Case Number: 3:2021cv00295
Filed: June 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2021 Filing 9 Mail (Document 7) addressed to Romeal Brice returned as undeliverable. (tlj)
August 5, 2021 Filing 8 Disregard docket entry, docketed in wrong case. Filing docketed in correct case 1:21-cv-174. Modified on 8/9/2021 (hms).
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Waiving Initial Partial Filing Fee and Directing Monthly Payments be Made from Prison Account of Romeal Brice. Directing correctional facility to transmit payments. Signed by the Clerk of Court on 8/3/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (hms)
July 19, 2021 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (Sealed - Court) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tlj)
July 16, 2021 Filing 5 Pro Se Prisoner Admin Remedy Statement by Romeal Brice (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(eef)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Prisoner Trust Account Statement of Plaintiff. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (hms)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by the Clerk of Court on 6/24/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(tlj)
June 22, 2021 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT - 1983 Application IFP (Sealed - Participants) re #1 Complaint by Romeal Brice (tlj)
June 22, 2021 Filing 1 Pro Se COMPLAINT against Alan Cloninger, Gaston County Sheriff's Department, FNU Marlowe, filed by Romeal Brice. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Envelope)(tlj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brice v. Marlowe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaston County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Marlowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Cloninger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Romeal Brice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?