Sturdivant v. USA
Petitioner: Devon Ramus Sturdivant
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 3:2021cv00306
Filed: June 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Robert J Conrad
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2021 Filing 4 Pro Se MOTION for Reconsideration re #3 Order, by Devon Ramus Sturdivant. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(js) Modified event on 8/16/2021 (js).
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Petitioner shall have 20 days from entry of this Order in which to explain to the Court why his Petition should not be dismissed. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 7/29/21. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mga)
July 29, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Petitioner's explanation why his petition should not be dismissed due by 8/18/2021. (mga)
July 9, 2021 Filing Fee Received: $ 5.00, receipt number CHD66428 (js)
June 28, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. The filing fee of $5.00 was not received or application to proceed without payment of fees and affidavit was not submitted. Application or Fee due by 7/19/2021. (js)
June 24, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(js)
June 24, 2021 Filing 1 Pro Se PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241, filed by Devon Ramus Sturdivant. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(js)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sturdivant v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Devon Ramus Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?