Crossroads Trucking Corp. v. TruNorth Warranty Plans of North America, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Crossroads Trucking Corp.
Defendant: 19th Capital Group, LLC and TruNorth Warranty Plans of North America, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00318
Filed: July 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Robert J Conrad
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2021 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Lindsey Grammel re #12 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and to Enforce Dispute Resolution Provision filed by TruNorth Warranty Plans of North America, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - First Warranty, #2 Exhibit B - Second Warranty, #3 Exhibit C - Third Warranty, #4 Exhibit D - Revised Nov. 20, 2020 Letter, #5 Exhibit E - TruNorth response letter Dec. 7, 2020, #6 Exhibit F - AAA Commercial Arbitration Rules)(Anderson, Scott)
August 23, 2021 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and to Enforce Dispute Resolution Provision by TruNorth Warranty Plans of North America, LLC. (Anderson, Scott)
August 23, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and to Enforce Dispute Resolution Provision by TruNorth Warranty Plans of North America, LLC. Responses due by 9/7/2021 (Anderson, Scott). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
July 23, 2021 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by 19th Capital Group, LLC. (Boyles, Susan). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. 19th Capital Group, LLC answer due 8/30/2021. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 7/23/2021. (DLG)
July 21, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Dustin T. Greene on behalf of 19th Capital Group, LLC (Green, Dustin T.) Modified docket text on 7/21/2021 (tlj).
July 21, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan H. Boyles on behalf of 19th Capital Group, LLC (Boyles, Susan)
July 20, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TruNorth Warranty Plans of North America, LLC (Anderson, Scott)
July 20, 2021 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by TruNorth Warranty Plans of North America, LLC. (Anderson, Scott). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. TruNorth Warranty Plans of North America, LLC's answer due 8/23/2021. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 7/20/2021. (DLG)
July 13, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: 19th Capital Group, LLC answer due 7/30/2021 pursuant to the service date indicated on the FedEx tracking (Doc. 5). (brl)
July 12, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crossroads Trucking Corp.. 19th Capital Group, LLC served on 7/9/2021, answer due 7/30/2021. (Terpening, William) Modified service and answer date on 7/13/2021 (brl).
July 8, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crossroads Trucking Corp.. TruNorth Warranty Plans of North America, LLC served on 7/2/2021, answer due 7/23/2021. (Terpening, William)
July 2, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to 19th Capital Group, LLC and TruNorth Warranty Plans of North America, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons TruNorth Warranty Plans of North America, LLC)(dgr)
July 2, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(dgr)
July 1, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crossroads Trucking Corp. (Terpening, William)
July 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 19th Capital Group, LLC, TruNorth Warranty Plans of North America, LLC with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0419-5100605), filed by Crossroads Trucking Corp..(Terpening, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crossroads Trucking Corp. v. TruNorth Warranty Plans of North America, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 19th Capital Group, LLC
Represented By: Dustin Timothy Greene
Represented By: Susan H. Boyles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TruNorth Warranty Plans of North America, LLC
Represented By: Scott David Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crossroads Trucking Corp.
Represented By: William R. Terpening
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?