We CBD, LLC et al v. Planet Nine Private Air, LLC
Plaintiff: We CBD, LLC and We C Manage, LLC
Defendant: Planet Nine Private Air, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00352
Filed: July 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Graham Mullen
2 Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1396
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 10/6/2021. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 9/3/2021. (DLG)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss by We C Manage, LLC, We CBD, LLC. Responses due by 9/16/2021 (Terpening, William). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss by Planet Nine Private Air, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Contract - Quote for Aircraft Services)(Levy, David)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Planet Nine Private Air, LLC. Responses due by 9/15/2021 (Levy, David)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Planet Nine Private Air, LLC. Responses due by 9/15/2021 (Levy, David). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER denying #7 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 9/1/2021. (DLG)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Planet Nine Private Air, LLC answer due 9/1/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 8/5/2021. (mek)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by Planet Nine Private Air, LLC. (Levy, David). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by David L. Levy on behalf of Planet Nine Private Air, LLC (Levy, David)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by We CBD, LLC, We C Manage, LLC. Planet Nine Private Air, LLC served on 7/21/2021, answer due 8/11/2021. (Terpening, William)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Case reassigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney. Senior Judge Graham Mullen no longer assigned to the case. (Related) This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (tmg)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Referral to Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. (tmg)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (tmg)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Planet Nine Private Air, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (dgr)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(dgr)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Planet Nine Private Air, LLC with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0419-5124406), filed by We CBD, LLC, We C Manage, LLC.(Terpening, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: We CBD, LLC et al v. Planet Nine Private Air, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: We CBD, LLC
Represented By: Carlin Georgia Robertson
Represented By: William R. Terpening
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: We C Manage, LLC
Represented By: Carlin Georgia Robertson
Represented By: William R. Terpening
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Planet Nine Private Air, LLC
Represented By: David L. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?