United States of America v. Von Streeruwitz
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Peter G. Von Streeruwitz
Case Number: 3:2021cv00380
Filed: July 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Robert J Conrad
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2021 Filing 5 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Peter G. Von Streeruwitz. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns (brl)
September 14, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Entry of Default by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gokce T. Yurekli, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order) (Yurekli, Gokce)
August 17, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Peter G. Von Streeruwitz served on 8/12/2021, answer due 9/2/2021. (Yurekli, Gokce)
July 28, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Peter G. Von Streeruwitz. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (dgr)
July 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Peter G. Von Streeruwitz, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Yurekli, Gokce)
July 28, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(dgr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Von Streeruwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Gokce Tugce Yurekli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter G. Von Streeruwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?