Whatley v. McFadden
Plaintiff: Quanterius Hommie Whatley
Defendant: Gary McFadden
Case Number: 3:2021cv00396
Filed: August 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2021 Filing 8 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (Sealed - Court) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(js)
September 14, 2021 Filing 7 Prisoner Admin Remedy Statement by Quanterius Hommie Whatley (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(js)
September 10, 2021 Filing 6 Letter from Gaston County Sheriff's Office re: Doc. No. 3 ORDER for Prisoner Trust Account Statement of Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Envelope)(eef)
August 19, 2021 Filing 5 Prisoner Admin Remedy Statement by Quanterius Hommie Whatley (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(js)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Prisoner Trust Account Statement of Plaintiff. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (hms)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Frank G. Johns, Clerk of Court on 8/2/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(dgr)
August 2, 2021 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT - 1983 Application IFP (Sealed - Participants) by Quanterius Hommie Whatley. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dgr)
August 2, 2021 Filing 1 Pro Se COMPLAINT against Gary McFadden, filed by Quanterius Hommie Whatley. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Proposed Summons)(dgr)
August 2, 2021 Case assigned to Chief Judge Martin Reidinger.(dgr) Modified to correct extra wording on 8/9/2021 (js).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whatley v. McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quanterius Hommie Whatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?