Pimintel v. Government Employees Insurance Company Inc.
Plaintiff: Michael Pimintel
Defendant: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY INC. d/b/a GEICO and Government Employees Insurance Company, Inc. doing business as Geico
Case Number: 3:2021cv00405
Filed: August 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Robert J Conrad
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Eric Hemmendinger for Government Employees Insurance Company, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 10/1/2021. (brl)
October 1, 2021 Notice to Eric Hemmendinger: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 10/8/2021. (brl)
September 30, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Eric Hemmendinger Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5248418. by Government Employees Insurance Company, Inc.. (Church, Brian). Motions referred to David Keesler.
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #18 Motion to Appear Telephonically or via Video at Scheduling Conference.Entered by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 9/30/2021. (brl)
September 29, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Telephonically or via Video at Scheduling Conference by Michael Pimintel. (Nestico, John) Modified event & text on 9/30/2021 (brl).
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Carolyn H. Cottrell for Michael Pimintel (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/29/2021. (brl)
September 29, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Carolyn H. Cottrell Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5245447. by Michael Pimintel. (Nestico, John). Motions referred to David Keesler.
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added David C. Leimbach for Michael Pimintel (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/29/2021. (mek)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Brett D. Watson for Michael Pimintel (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/29/2021. (mek)
September 29, 2021 Notice to Brett D. Watson: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 10/6/2021. (mek)
September 29, 2021 Notice to Carolyn H. Cottrell: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 10/6/2021. (brl)
September 29, 2021 Notice to David C. Leimbach: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 10/6/2021. (mek)
September 28, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David C. Leimbach Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5243998. by Michael Pimintel. (Nestico, John). Motions referred to David Keesler.
September 28, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Brett D. Watson Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5243967. by Michael Pimintel. (Nestico, John). Motions referred to David Keesler.
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER that a Scheduling Conference is set for 10/18/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom #4A, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Robert J. Conrad Jr. The pre-discovery disclosures as required under Rule 26(a)(1) are due by 10/15/2021. Entered by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 9/27/2021. (brl)
September 23, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by Government Employees Insurance Company, Inc..(Church, Brian)
September 23, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Church, Brian)
September 23, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Michael Pimintel. (Nestico, John) Modified text on 9/24/2021 (brl).
September 10, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Government Employees Insurance Company, Inc., filed by Michael Pimintel.(Nestico, John)
September 2, 2021 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 9/23/2021. (brl)
September 1, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Government Employees Insurance Company, Inc..(Doerr, Adam)
September 1, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Government Employees Insurance Company, Inc. (Doerr, Adam)
September 1, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan Patrick Biffany on behalf of Government Employees Insurance Company, Inc. (Biffany, Brendan)
September 1, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Lee Church on behalf of Government Employees Insurance Company, Inc. (Church, Brian)
September 1, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Karl Doerr on behalf of Government Employees Insurance Company, Inc. (Doerr, Adam)
August 6, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Government Employees Insurance Company Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (kab)
August 6, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr. and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(kab)
August 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Government Employees Insurance Company Inc. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0419-5152328), filed by Michael Pimintel. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Nestico, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pimintel v. Government Employees Insurance Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Pimintel
Represented By: John Joseph Nestico
Represented By: Brett David Watson
Represented By: Carolyn Hunt Cottrell
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY INC. d/b/a GEICO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Government Employees Insurance Company, Inc. doing business as Geico
Represented By: Adam Karl Doerr
Represented By: Brendan Patrick Biffany
Represented By: Brian Lee Church
Represented By: Eric Hemmendinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?