Paramount Staffing, LLC v. Paramount Staffing Solutions LLC et al
Plaintiff: Paramount Staffing, LLC
Defendant: Paramount Staffing Solutions LLC, Paramount Staffing Inc., Paramount Staffing LLC, Paramount Staffing Perm LLC, Matthew Schubert, Tina Schubert and Gilles Tanneur
Case Number: 3:2021cv00467
Filed: September 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Robert J Conrad
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #22 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Responses due by 11/15/2021 (mek)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Consent Motion For Extension Of Time To Respond To Amended Complaint And Amended Motion For Preliminary Injunction re #21 Amended Complaint and #22 Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Defendants Paramount Staffing LLC, Paramount Staffing Perm LLC, Paramount Staffing Solutions LLC, Gilles Tanneur shall file Answers and/or Responses to the Amended Complaint and Amended Motion For Preliminary Injunction, or in the alternative a Notice Of Settlement, on or before November 15, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 10/28/2021. (mek)
October 28, 2021 Filing 23 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #21 Amended Complaint and #22 Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Paramount Staffing LLC, Paramount Staffing Perm LLC, Paramount Staffing Solutions LLC, Gilles Tanneur. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ogburn, Thomas). Motions referred to David Keesler.
October 18, 2021 Filing 22 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Paramount Staffing, LLC. Responses due by 11/1/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Amended Motion) (Guidry, David)
October 18, 2021 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Plaintiffs, filed by Paramount Staffing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A ZipRecruiter Ad, #2 Exhibit B Indeed Review, #3 Exhibit C Defs Demand Letter)(Guidry, David)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Defendants' Second Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Responses due by 10/27/2021. In the alternative, the parties may file a Notice of Settlement on or before 10/27/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 10/13/21. (mga)
October 13, 2021 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Paramount Staffing LLC, Paramount Staffing Perm LLC, Paramount Staffing Solutions LLC, Gilles Tanneur. Responses due by 10/27/2021 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ogburn, Thomas). Motions referred to David Keesler.
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Defendants Paramount Staffing Solutions, LLC, Paramount Staffing LLC, Paramount Staffing Perm LLC, and Gilles Tanneur Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Responses due by 10/15/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 10/7/21. (mga)
October 7, 2021 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Paramount Staffing LLC, Paramount Staffing Perm LLC, Paramount Staffing Solutions LLC, Gilles Tanneur. Responses due by 10/21/2021 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ogburn, Thomas). Motions referred to David Keesler.
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Shaina P. Wolfe for Paramount Staffing LLC, Paramount Staffing Perm LLC,Paramount Staffing Solutions LLC, and Gilles Tanneur (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/28/21. (mga)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Brad R. Maurer for Paramount Staffing LLC, Paramount Staffing Perm LLC,Paramount Staffing Solutions LLC, and Gilles Tanneur (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/28/21. (mga)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added James A. Hinshaw for Paramount Staffing LLC, Paramount Staffing Perm LLC, Paramount Staffing Solutions LLC, and Gilles Tanneur (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/28/21. (mga)
September 28, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Shaina P. Wolfe Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5243189. by Paramount Staffing LLC, Paramount Staffing Perm LLC, Paramount Staffing Solutions LLC, Gilles Tanneur. (Ogburn, Thomas). Motions referred to David Keesler.
September 28, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Brad R. Maurer Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5243163. by Paramount Staffing LLC, Paramount Staffing Perm LLC, Paramount Staffing Solutions LLC, Gilles Tanneur. (Ogburn, Thomas). Motions referred to David Keesler.
September 28, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to James A. Hinshaw Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5243097. by Paramount Staffing LLC, Paramount Staffing Perm LLC, Paramount Staffing Solutions LLC, Gilles Tanneur. (Ogburn, Thomas). Motions referred to David Keesler.
September 28, 2021 Notice to Brad R. Maurer: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 10/5/2021. (mga)
September 28, 2021 Notice to James A. Hinshaw: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 10/5/2021. (mga)
September 28, 2021 Notice to Shaina P. Wolfe: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 10/5/2021. (mga)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting Defendants Paramount Staffing Solutions, LLC, Paramount Staffing LLC, Paramount Staffing Perm LLC, and Gilles Tanneurs #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Responses due by 10/8/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/24/2021. (brl)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Paramount Staffing LLC, Paramount Staffing Perm LLC, Paramount Staffing Solutions LLC, and Gilles Tanneur answer due 10/27/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/24/2021. (brl)
September 23, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas L. Ogburn, III on behalf of Paramount Staffing LLC, Paramount Staffing Perm LLC, Paramount Staffing Solutions LLC, Gilles Tanneur (Ogburn, Thomas)
September 23, 2021 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Paramount Staffing LLC, Paramount Staffing Perm LLC, Paramount Staffing Solutions LLC, Gilles Tanneur. Responses due by 10/7/2021 (Durnovich, John). Motions referred to David Keesler.
September 23, 2021 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint, by Paramount Staffing LLC, Paramount Staffing Perm LLC, Paramount Staffing Solutions LLC, Gilles Tanneur. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Durnovich, John). Motions referred to David Keesler.
September 23, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John Michael Durnovich on behalf of Paramount Staffing LLC, Paramount Staffing Perm LLC, Paramount Staffing Solutions LLC, Gilles Tanneur (Durnovich, John)
September 10, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Paramount Staffing, LLC. Responses due by 9/24/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Brief In Support) (Guidry, David)
September 7, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(eef)
September 7, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Paramount Staffing, LLC (Guidry, David)
September 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-5205654), filed by Paramount Staffing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - ZipRecruiter Ad, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Indeed Review, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - Defs Demand Ltr, #4 Cover Sheet)(Guidry, David) (Attachment 4 replaced on 9/7/2021) (eef).
September 7, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(eef)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paramount Staffing, LLC v. Paramount Staffing Solutions LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paramount Staffing, LLC
Represented By: David G. Guidry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramount Staffing Solutions LLC
Represented By: Brad Richard Maurer
Represented By: James Michael Hinshaw
Represented By: John Michael Durnovich
Represented By: Shaina P. Wolfe
Represented By: Thomas L. Ogburn, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramount Staffing Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramount Staffing LLC
Represented By: Brad Richard Maurer
Represented By: James Michael Hinshaw
Represented By: John Michael Durnovich
Represented By: Shaina P. Wolfe
Represented By: Thomas L. Ogburn, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramount Staffing Perm LLC
Represented By: Brad Richard Maurer
Represented By: James Michael Hinshaw
Represented By: John Michael Durnovich
Represented By: Shaina P. Wolfe
Represented By: Thomas L. Ogburn, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilles Tanneur
Represented By: Brad Richard Maurer
Represented By: James Michael Hinshaw
Represented By: John Michael Durnovich
Represented By: Shaina P. Wolfe
Represented By: Thomas L. Ogburn, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?