Cruise v. Smith & Nephew, Inc
Plaintiff: Kelly Cruise
Defendant: Smith & Nephew, Inc and Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00512
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Robert J Conrad
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER administratively denying as moot without prejudice #7 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 11/17/2021. (mek) (Main Document 10 replaced on 11/17/2021) (mek).
November 16, 2021 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum of Law in Support by Kelly Cruise. Replies due by 11/23/2021 (Bumgardner, Thomas)
November 16, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Kelly Cruise.(Bumgardner, Thomas)
November 4, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum of Law in Support by Smith & Nephew, Inc.. Responses due by 11/18/2021 (Osowski, Paul). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Smith & Nephew, Inc answer due 11/4/2021. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 9/29/2021. (KCA)
September 28, 2021 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Smith & Nephew, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Osowski, Paul). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Terri S. Reiskin for Smith & Nephew, Inc (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 9/28/2021. (mek)
September 28, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Douglas Maclatchie, Jr on behalf of Smith & Nephew, Inc (Maclatchie, Scott)
September 28, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Terri S. Reiskin Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5242888. by Smith & Nephew, Inc. (Osowski, Paul). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
September 28, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Smith & Nephew, Inc (Osowski, Paul)
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Gaston County Superior Court, case number 21-CVS-3443. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-5242780), filed by Smith & Nephew, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - State Court Pleadings)(Osowski, Paul)
September 28, 2021 Notice to Terri S. Reiskin: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 10/5/2021. (mek)
September 28, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(dgr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruise v. Smith & Nephew, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Cruise
Represented By: Thomas Donald Bumgardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Nephew, Inc
Represented By: Paul Joseph Osowski
Represented By: Scott Douglas Maclatchie, Jr.
Represented By: Terri S. Reiskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Joseph Osowski
Represented By: Scott Douglas Maclatchie, Jr.
Represented By: Terri Steinhaus Reiskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?