Avadis et al v. Azar et al
Plaintiff: Avadis Avadis, Total Solutions Property Management, LLC and AA Total Solutions, LLC
Defendant: Souheil Anthony Azar, Jalal John Azar, Ron Bates, Ashley Adams, Macc Venture Partners, LLC, Capstone Multi-Family Group, LLC, Wendover Investors, LLC, Wendover Management, LLC, WW Investors, LLC, Green Manor Investors, LLC, Green Manor Managers, LLC, Falcon Pointe Investors, LLC, Falcon Pointe Managers, LLC, Rockwall Commons, LLC, Rockwall Commons Founder, LLC, Southern Pines Apartments, LLC, Kingswood Financial, Fast Express Mart, LLC, Gaston Portfolio Investors, LLC, Tripoint Diagnostic, PLLC, May Azar, Garron Solomon and Robin Kirby
Case Number: 3:2021cv00514
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Max O Cogburn
2 Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 83 Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan: Estimated Trial Time: ten days. Discovery due by 4/28/2023. Motions due by 6/16/2023. Mediation deadline set for 5/16/2023. Ready Date for Trial set for 10/16/2023 09:30 AM in Courtroom #5A, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Max O. Cogburn Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 9/26/2022. (mek)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 82 CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan)(Rodriguez, Christine)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER denying #76 Motion for Leave to Appeal; denying Motion for Reconsideration re #74 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 9/5/2022. (ams)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 80 REPLY to Response to Motion re #76 MOTION for Leave to Appeal to Amend Order to Certify Interlocutory Appeal MOTION for Reconsideration re #74 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim by Jalal John Azar, Souheil Anthony Azar, Ron Bates. (Mouw, Gary)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ANSWER to #55 Amended Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses (Jury Trial Demanded) by Jalal John Azar, Souheil Anthony Azar, Ron Bates.(Mouw, Gary)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 78 RESPONSE in Opposition re #76 MOTION for Leave to Appeal to Amend Order to Certify Interlocutory Appeal MOTION for Reconsideration re #74 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim by AA Total Solutions, LLC, Avadis Avadis, Total Solutions Property Management, LLC. Replies due by 8/25/2022 (Rodriguez, Christine)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MEMORANDUM in Support re #76 MOTION for Leave to Appeal to Amend Order to Certify Interlocutory Appeal MOTION for Reconsideration re #74 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim by Jalal John Azar, Souheil Anthony Azar, Ron Bates. (Mouw, Gary)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MOTION for Leave to Appeal to Amend Order to Certify Interlocutory Appeal, MOTION for Reconsideration re #74 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim ( Responses due by 8/19/2022 ) by Jalal John Azar, Souheil Anthony Azar, Ron Bates. (Mouw, Gary). Modified on 8/8/2022 to remove referral (mek).
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #55 Amended Complaint, by Jalal John Azar, Souheil Anthony Azar, Ron Bates. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Mouw, Gary). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #75 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #55 Amended Complaint. Defendants' answer due 8/23/2022. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 8/3/2022. (DLG)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER denying #59 Defendants Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 7/26/2022. (ef)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order SECOND Notice to Stefan Savic: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 7/26/2022. (rth)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting #72 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Brian L. Grossman for AA Total Solutions, LLC, Avadis Avadis, Total Solutions Property Management, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 7/11/2022. (mek)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Brian L. Grossman Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5650713. by AA Total Solutions, LLC, Avadis Avadis, Total Solutions Property Management, LLC. (Rodriguez, Christine). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting #70 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Stefan Savic for AA Total Solutions, LLC, Avadis Avadis, and Total Solutions Property Management, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 7/11/2022. (kab)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice to Brian L. Grossman: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 7/18/2022. (mek)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice to Stefan Savic: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 7/18/2022. (kab)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Stefan Savic Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5649118. by AA Total Solutions, LLC, Avadis Avadis, Total Solutions Property Management, LLC. (Rodriguez, Christine). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Notice of Substitution of Counsel by Christine A. Rodriguez on behalf of Total Solutions Property Management, LLC, Avadis Avadis, AA Total Solutions, LLC, Attorney Edmundo Espinoza terminated. (Rodriguez, Christine)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry: MOTION HEARING held before District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. Re #59 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion taken under advisement, order to issue. Plaintiffs attorney: Christine Rodriguez, Edmundo Espinoza. Defendants attorney: Gary Mouw, Edward Hennessey, IV. Court reporter: Deborah Cohen-Rojas. (ams)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 NOTICE of Organizational Chart for TSPM by AA Total Solutions, LLC, Avadis Avadis, Total Solutions Property Management, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Espinoza, Edmundo)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: #59 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim : Motion Hearing set for 6/13/2022 11:00 AM in Courtroom #5A, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Max O. Cogburn Jr. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(ams)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 NOTICE of hearing status by AA Total Solutions, LLC, Avadis Avadis, Total Solutions Property Management, LLC re #66 Order on Motion to Continue Other (Espinoza, Edmundo)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting #65 Motion to Continue Motion Hearing. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 3/25/2022. (ams)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Joint MOTION to Continue Hearing on Motion to Dismiss Scheduled for April 18, 2022 by Jalal John Azar, Souheil Anthony Azar, Ron Bates. Responses due by 4/5/2022 (Mouw, Gary)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: #59 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim : Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2022 09:30 AM in Courtroom #5A, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Max O. Cogburn Jr. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(ams)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER terminating as MOOT #50 Motion to Dismiss; terminating as MOOT #52 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 2/15/2022. (ams) (Main Document 64 replaced on 2/25/2022) (ams).
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 REPLY to Response to Motion re #59 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Jalal John Azar, Souheil Anthony Azar, Ron Bates. (Mouw, Gary)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #59 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Jalal John Azar, Souheil Anthony Azar, Ron Bates. Responses due by 2/9/2022 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Mouw, Gary). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #62 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply re: #59 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Replies due by 2/4/2022. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 1/26/2022. (DLG)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #59 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by AA Total Solutions, LLC, Avadis Avadis, Total Solutions Property Management, LLC. Replies due by 2/1/2022 (Rodriguez, Christine)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MEMORANDUM in Support re #59 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Jalal John Azar, Souheil Anthony Azar, Ron Bates. (Mouw, Gary)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Jalal John Azar, Souheil Anthony Azar, Ron Bates. Responses due by 1/25/2022 (Mouw, Gary)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Notice of Substitution of Counsel by William R. Terpening, Christine A. Rodriguez on behalf of Total Solutions Property Management, LLC, Avadis Avadis, AA Total Solutions, LLC, Attorney William R. Terpening terminated. (Terpening, William)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal for Rockwall Commons, LLC, Rockwall Commons Founder, LLC and Southern Pines Apartments, LLC by AA Total Solutions, LLC, Avadis Avadis, Total Solutions Property Management, LLC (Espinoza, Edmundo)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #55 Amended Complaint, by Jalal John Azar, Souheil Anthony Azar, Ron Bates. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Mouw, Gary). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #56 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re: #55 Amended Complaint. Jalal John Azar answer due 1/11/2022; Souheil Anthony Azar answer due 1/11/2022; Ron Bates answer due 1/11/2022. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 12/14/2021. (DLG)
December 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Jalal John Azar, Souheil Anthony Azar, Ron Bates, filed by Total Solutions Property Management, LLC, Avadis Avadis, AA Total Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Wakil Indictment)(Terpening, William)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motions to Dismiss by AA Total Solutions, LLC, Avadis Avadis, Total Solutions Property Management, LLC. Responses due by 12/8/2021 (Espinoza, Edmundo). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #54 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #50 MOTION to Dismiss, #52 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 12/22/2021. Replies due by 1/11/2022. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 11/24/2021. (DLG)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM in Support re #52 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Ashley Adams, Jalal John Azar, Souheil Anthony Azar, Ron Bates, Capstone Multi-Family Group, LLC, Falcon Pointe Investors, LLC, Falcon Pointe Managers, LLC, Fast Express Mart, LLC, Gaston Portfolio Investors, LLC, Green Manor Investors, LLC, Green Manor Managers, LLC, Kingswood Financial, Macc Venture Partners, LLC, WW Investors, LLC, Wendover Investors, LLC, Wendover Management, LLC. (Gibson, Regan)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Ashley Adams, Jalal John Azar, Souheil Anthony Azar, Ron Bates, Capstone Multi-Family Group, LLC, Falcon Pointe Investors, LLC, Falcon Pointe Managers, LLC, Fast Express Mart, LLC, Gaston Portfolio Investors, LLC, Green Manor Investors, LLC, Green Manor Managers, LLC, Kingswood Financial, Macc Venture Partners, LLC, WW Investors, LLC, Wendover Investors, LLC, Wendover Management, LLC. Responses due by 12/7/2021 (Gibson, Regan)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM in Support re #50 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process and by Rockwall Commons Founder, LLC, Rockwall Commons, LLC, Southern Pines Apartments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Robert Bowman)(Adams, Michael)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and, MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process and by Rockwall Commons Founder, LLC, Rockwall Commons, LLC, Southern Pines Apartments, LLC. Responses due by 12/7/2021 (Adams, Michael)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER finding as moot #10 Motion to Set Uniform Response Deadline. Text of Order: The Motion for Extension of Time #48 was granted and Answer dates were set in the Text Order dated 10/29/2021. Therefore, the Court dismisses the Motion as moot. So Ordered. Entered by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 11/3/2021. (ams)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Marshall G. Jones on behalf of Rockwall Commons Founder, LLC, Rockwall Commons, LLC, Southern Pines Apartments, LLC (Jones, Marshall)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint,,, by Ashley Adams, Jalal John Azar, Souheil Anthony Azar, Ron Bates, Capstone Multi-Family Group, LLC, Falcon Pointe Investors, LLC, Falcon Pointe Managers, LLC, Fast Express Mart, LLC, Gaston Portfolio Investors, LLC, Green Manor Investors, LLC, Green Manor Managers, LLC, Kingswood Financial, Macc Venture Partners, LLC, WW Investors, LLC, Wendover Investors, LLC, Wendover Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hennessey, Edward). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #48 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint. Ashley Adams answer due 11/23/2021; Jalal John Azar answer due 11/23/2021; Souheil Anthony Azar answer due 11/23/2021; Ron Bates answer due 11/23/2021; Capstone Multi-Family Group, LLC answer due 11/23/2021; Falcon Pointe Investors, LLC answer due 11/23/2021; Falcon Pointe Managers, LLC answer due 11/23/2021; Fast Express Mart, LLC answer due 11/23/2021; Gaston Portfolio Investors, LLC answer due 11/23/2021; Green Manor Investors, LLC answer due 11/23/2021; Green Manor Managers, LLC answer due 11/23/2021; Kingswood Financial answer due 11/23/2021; Macc Venture Partners, LLC answer due 11/23/2021; WW Investors, LLC answer due 12/23/2021; Wendover Investors, LLC answer due 11/23/2021; Wendover Management, LLC answer due 11/23/2021. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/29/2021. (DLG)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Gary J. Mouw for Ashley Adams, Jalal John Azar, Souheil Anthony Azar, Ron Bates, Capstone Multi-Family Group, LLC, Falcon Pointe Investors, LLC, Falcon Pointe Managers, LLC, Fast Express Mart, LLC, Gaston Portfolio Investors, LLC, Green Manor Investors, LLC, Green Manor Managers, LLC, Kingswood Financial, Macc Venture Partners, LLC, WW Investors, LLC, Wendover Investors, LLC, Wendover Management, LLC; granting #24 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Regan A. Gibson for Ashley Adams, Jalal John Azar, Souheil Anthony Azar, Ron Bates, Capstone Multi-Family Group, LLC, Falcon Pointe Investors, LLC, Falcon Pointe Managers, LLC, Fast Express Mart, LLC, Gaston Portfolio Investors, LLC, Green Manor Investors, LLC, Green Manor Managers, LLC, Kingswood Financial, Macc Venture Partners, LLC, WW Investors, LLC, Wendover Investors, LLC, Wendover Management, LLC; granting #25 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Ronald G. DeWaard for Ashley Adams, Jalal John Azar, Souheil Anthony Azar, Ron Bates, Capstone Multi-Family Group, LLC, Falcon Pointe Investors, LLC, Falcon Pointe Managers, LLC, Fast Express Mart, LLC, Gaston Portfolio Investors, LLC, Green Manor Investors, LLC, Green Manor Managers, LLC, Kingswood Financial, Macc Venture Partners, LLC, WW Investors, LLC, Wendover Investors, LLC, Wendover Management, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Attorneys served via NEF). Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/28/2021. (mek)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice to Gary J. Mouw: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 11/4/2021. (mek)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice to Ronald G. DeWaard: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 11/4/2021. (mek)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice to REgan A. Gibson: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 11/4/2021. (mek)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Deleted. Docketed in error (ams).
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rockwall Commons, LLC (Adams, Michael)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Southern Pines Apartments, LLC (Adams, Michael)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rockwall Commons Founder, LLC (Adams, Michael)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint,,, by Rockwall Commons Founder, LLC, Rockwall Commons, LLC, Southern Pines Apartments, LLC. (Adams, Michael). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #43 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint. Rockwall Commons Founder, LLC answer due 11/23/2021; Rockwall Commons, LLC answer due 11/23/2021; Southern Pines Apartments, LLC answer due 11/23/2021. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/27/2021. (DLG)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Avadis Avadis. Southern Pines Apartments, LLC served on 10/12/2021, answer due 11/2/2021. (Espinoza, Edmundo)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Avadis Avadis. Gaston Portfolio Investors, LLC served on 10/5/2021. (Espinoza, Edmundo)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Avadis Avadis. Fast Express Mart, LLC served on 10/5/2021. (Espinoza, Edmundo)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Avadis Avadis. Kingswood Financial served on 10/5/2021. (Espinoza, Edmundo)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Avadis Avadis. Falcon Pointe Managers, LLC served on 10/5/2021. (Espinoza, Edmundo)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Avadis Avadis. Falcon Pointe Investors, LLC served on 10/5/2021. (Espinoza, Edmundo)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Avadis Avadis. Green Manor Managers, LLC served on 10/5/2021. (Espinoza, Edmundo)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Avadis Avadis. Green Manor Investors, LLC served on 10/5/2021. (Espinoza, Edmundo)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Avadis Avadis. WW Investors, LLC served on 10/19/2021, answer due 11/9/2021. (Espinoza, Edmundo)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Avadis Avadis. Wendover Management, LLC served on 10/5/2021. (Espinoza, Edmundo)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Avadis Avadis. Wendover Investors, LLC served on 10/5/2021. (Espinoza, Edmundo)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Avadis Avadis. Capstone Multi-Family Group, LLC served on 10/5/2021. (Espinoza, Edmundo)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Avadis Avadis. Macc Venture Partners, LLC served on 10/5/2021. (Espinoza, Edmundo)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Avadis Avadis. Ashley Adams served on 10/22/2021. (Espinoza, Edmundo)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Avadis Avadis. Ron Bates served on 10/22/2021. (Espinoza, Edmundo)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Avadis Avadis. Jalal John Azar served on 10/22/2021. (Espinoza, Edmundo)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Avadis Avadis. Souheil Anthony Azar served on 10/5/2021. (Espinoza, Edmundo)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Case reassigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. District Judge Frank D. Whitney no longer assigned to the case due to conflict. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(thh)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Ronald G. DeWaard Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5270082. by Ashley Adams, Jalal John Azar, Souheil Anthony Azar, Ron Bates, Capstone Multi-Family Group, LLC, Falcon Pointe Investors, LLC, Falcon Pointe Managers, LLC, Fast Express Mart, LLC, Gaston Portfolio Investors, LLC, Green Manor Investors, LLC, Green Manor Managers, LLC, Kingswood Financial, Macc Venture Partners, LLC, WW Investors, LLC, Wendover Investors, LLC, Wendover Management, LLC. (Hennessey, Edward). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Regan A. Gibson Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5270065. by Ashley Adams, Jalal John Azar, Souheil Anthony Azar, Ron Bates, Capstone Multi-Family Group, LLC, Falcon Pointe Investors, LLC, Falcon Pointe Managers, LLC, Fast Express Mart, LLC, Gaston Portfolio Investors, LLC, Green Manor Investors, LLC, Green Manor Managers, LLC, Kingswood Financial, Macc Venture Partners, LLC, WW Investors, LLC, Wendover Investors, LLC, Wendover Management, LLC. (Hennessey, Edward). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Gary J. Mouw Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5269992. by Ashley Adams, Jalal John Azar, Souheil Anthony Azar, Ron Bates, Capstone Multi-Family Group, LLC, Falcon Pointe Investors, LLC, Falcon Pointe Managers, LLC, Fast Express Mart, LLC, Gaston Portfolio Investors, LLC, Green Manor Investors, LLC, Green Manor Managers, LLC, Kingswood Financial, Macc Venture Partners, LLC, WW Investors, LLC, Wendover Investors, LLC, Wendover Management, LLC. (Hennessey, Edward). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WW Investors, LLC (Hennessey, Edward)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wendover Management, LLC (Hennessey, Edward)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wendover Investors, LLC (Hennessey, Edward)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Macc Venture Partners, LLC (Hennessey, Edward)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kingswood Financial (Hennessey, Edward)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Green Manor Managers, LLC (Hennessey, Edward)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Green Manor Investors, LLC (Hennessey, Edward)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gaston Portfolio Investors, LLC (Hennessey, Edward)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fast Express Mart, LLC (Hennessey, Edward)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Falcon Pointe Managers, LLC (Hennessey, Edward)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Falcon Pointe Investors, LLC (Hennessey, Edward)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Capstone Multi-Family Group, LLC (Hennessey, Edward)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint,,, /Agreed Stipulation Setting Uniform Response Deadline for Certain Defendants by Ashley Adams, Jalal John Azar, Souheil Anthony Azar, Ron Bates, Capstone Multi-Family Group, LLC, Falcon Pointe Investors, LLC, Falcon Pointe Managers, LLC, Fast Express Mart, LLC, Gaston Portfolio Investors, LLC, Green Manor Investors, LLC, Green Manor Managers, LLC, Kingswood Financial, Macc Venture Partners, LLC, WW Investors, LLC, Wendover Investors, LLC, Wendover Management, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hennessey, Edward)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Edmundo Espinoza for AA Total Solutions, LLC, Avadis Avadis, Total Solutions Property Management, LLC. (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 9/30/2021. (mek)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice to Edmundo Espinoza: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 10/7/2021. (mek)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Summons Issued Electronically as to Jalal John Azar, May Azar, Green Manor Managers, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(js)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons Issued Electronically as to Souheil Anthony Azar, Ron Bates, Capstone Multi-Family Group, LLC, Falcon Pointe Investors, LLC, Falcon Pointe Managers, LLC, Fast Express Mart, LLC, Gaston Portfolio Investors, LLC, Green Manor Investors, LLC, Kingswood Financial, Robin Kirby, Macc Venture Partners, LLC, Rockwall Commons Founder, LLC, Rockwall Commons, LLC, Garron Solomon, Southern Pines Apartments, LLC, Tripoint Diagnostic, PLLC, WW Investors, LLC, Wendover Investors, LLC, Wendover Management, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons)(js)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AA Total Solutions, LLC (Terpening, William)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Total Solutions Property Management, LLC (Terpening, William)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Avadis Avadis (Terpening, William)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Edmundo Espinoza Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5243856. by AA Total Solutions, LLC, Avadis Avadis, Total Solutions Property Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration) (Terpening, William). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Ashley Adams. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (js)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ashley Adams, Jalal John Azar, May Azar, Souheil Anthony Azar, Ron Bates, Capstone Multi-Family Group, LLC, Falcon Pointe Investors, LLC, Falcon Pointe Managers, LLC, Fast Express Mart, LLC, Gaston Portfolio Investors, LLC, Green Manor Investors, LLC, Green Manor Managers, LLC, Kingswood Financial, Robin Kirby, Macc Venture Partners, LLC, Rockwall Commons Founder, LLC, Rockwall Commons, LLC, Garron Solomon, Southern Pines Apartments, LLC, Tripoint Diagnostic, PLLC, WW Investors, LLC, Wendover Investors, LLC, Wendover Management, LLC with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-5243332), filed by Total Solutions Property Management, LLC, Avadis Avadis, AA Total Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Naman Wakil Indictment)(Terpening, William)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Case assigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(js)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (js)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avadis et al v. Azar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avadis Avadis
Represented By: William R. Terpening
Represented By: Edmundo Espinoza
Represented By: Christine A. Rodriguez
Represented By: Brian L. Grossman
Represented By: Stefan Savic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Total Solutions Property Management, LLC
Represented By: William R. Terpening
Represented By: Edmundo Espinoza
Represented By: Christine A. Rodriguez
Represented By: Brian L. Grossman
Represented By: Stefan Savic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AA Total Solutions, LLC
Represented By: William R. Terpening
Represented By: Edmundo Espinoza
Represented By: Christine A. Rodriguez
Represented By: Brian L. Grossman
Represented By: Stefan Savic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Souheil Anthony Azar
Represented By: Edward Francis Hennessey, IV
Represented By: Gary J. Mouw
Represented By: Regan A. Gibson
Represented By: Ronald G. DeWaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jalal John Azar
Represented By: Edward Francis Hennessey, IV
Represented By: Gary J. Mouw
Represented By: Regan A. Gibson
Represented By: Ronald G. DeWaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Bates
Represented By: Edward Francis Hennessey, IV
Represented By: Gary J. Mouw
Represented By: Regan A. Gibson
Represented By: Ronald G. DeWaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Adams
Represented By: Edward Francis Hennessey, IV
Represented By: Gary J. Mouw
Represented By: Regan A. Gibson
Represented By: Ronald G. DeWaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macc Venture Partners, LLC
Represented By: Edward Francis Hennessey, IV
Represented By: Gary J. Mouw
Represented By: Regan A. Gibson
Represented By: Ronald G. DeWaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capstone Multi-Family Group, LLC
Represented By: Edward Francis Hennessey, IV
Represented By: Gary J. Mouw
Represented By: Regan A. Gibson
Represented By: Ronald G. DeWaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendover Investors, LLC
Represented By: Edward Francis Hennessey, IV
Represented By: Gary J. Mouw
Represented By: Regan A. Gibson
Represented By: Ronald G. DeWaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendover Management, LLC
Represented By: Edward Francis Hennessey, IV
Represented By: Gary J. Mouw
Represented By: Regan A. Gibson
Represented By: Ronald G. DeWaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WW Investors, LLC
Represented By: Edward Francis Hennessey, IV
Represented By: Gary J. Mouw
Represented By: Ronald G. DeWaard
Represented By: Regan A. Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Manor Investors, LLC
Represented By: Edward Francis Hennessey, IV
Represented By: Gary J. Mouw
Represented By: Regan A. Gibson
Represented By: Ronald G. DeWaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Manor Managers, LLC
Represented By: Gary J. Mouw
Represented By: Edward Francis Hennessey, IV
Represented By: Regan A. Gibson
Represented By: Ronald G. DeWaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Falcon Pointe Investors, LLC
Represented By: Gary J. Mouw
Represented By: Edward Francis Hennessey, IV
Represented By: Regan A. Gibson
Represented By: Ronald G. DeWaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Falcon Pointe Managers, LLC
Represented By: Edward Francis Hennessey, IV
Represented By: Gary J. Mouw
Represented By: Regan A. Gibson
Represented By: Ronald G. DeWaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwall Commons, LLC
Represented By: Michael G. Adams
Represented By: Marshall G. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwall Commons Founder, LLC
Represented By: Michael G. Adams
Represented By: Marshall G. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Pines Apartments, LLC
Represented By: Michael G. Adams
Represented By: Marshall G. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingswood Financial
Represented By: Edward Francis Hennessey, IV
Represented By: Gary J. Mouw
Represented By: Regan A. Gibson
Represented By: Ronald G. DeWaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fast Express Mart, LLC
Represented By: Gary J. Mouw
Represented By: Regan A. Gibson
Represented By: Edward Francis Hennessey, IV
Represented By: Ronald G. DeWaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaston Portfolio Investors, LLC
Represented By: Edward Francis Hennessey, IV
Represented By: Gary J. Mouw
Represented By: Regan A. Gibson
Represented By: Ronald G. DeWaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tripoint Diagnostic, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: May Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garron Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?