MByte Tech Hongkong Limited v. AddShoppers, Inc.
Plaintiff: MByte Tech Hongkong Limited, a Hong Kong Limited Company and MByte Tech Hongkong Limited
Defendant: AddShoppers, Inc. doing business as Minty.com and AddShoppers, Inc. a Delaware Corporation doing business as Minty.com
Case Number: 3:2021cv00515
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2021 Filing 21 TRANSCRIPT of motion for preliminary injunction held on 11/16/2021 before Judge Frank D. Whitney. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Policy at www.ncwd.uscourts.gov Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/17/2022. (Reporter: Deborah Cohen-Rojas, 704-350-7400)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The Court DIRECTS Defendant to file an answer by the already-established deadline of December 6, 2021, even if its accompanied by a motion to dismiss. The Court also DIRECTS the parties to conduct the Initial Attorneys Conference as soon as possible after the responsive pleading is filed and to file to Rule 26(f) report no later than Friday, December 10, 2021, so that a case management order can promptly issue. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 11/16/21. (clc)
November 16, 2021 Minute Entry: MOTION HEARING held before District Judge Frank D. Whitney. Re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Plaintiffs attorney: Nihat Bayramoglu & Alexander Ruzzier. Defendants attorney: Daniel Huynh. Court reporter: Deborah Cohen-Rojas. (clc)
November 16, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: CIAC Report due by 12/10/2021. (clc)
November 2, 2021 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Biping Meng re #17 Reply to Response to Motion filed by MByte Tech Hongkong Limited (Bayramoglu, Nihat)
November 2, 2021 Filing 18 DECLARATION of David Silver, Esq. re #17 Reply to Response to Motion filed by MByte Tech Hongkong Limited (Bayramoglu, Nihat)
November 2, 2021 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by MByte Tech Hongkong Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 12, #2 Exhibit 13, #3 Exhibit 14)(Bayramoglu, Nihat)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 11/16/2021 11:00 AM in Courtroom #5B, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Frank D. Whitney.. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 10/27/21. (clc)
October 26, 2021 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Jon West re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #13 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by AddShoppers, Inc. (Huynh, Daniel)
October 26, 2021 Filing 14 DECLARATION re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #13 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by AddShoppers, Inc. (Huynh, Daniel)
October 26, 2021 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by AddShoppers, Inc.. Replies due by 11/2/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Huynh, Daniel)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Nihat Deniz Bayramoglu for MByte Tech Hongkong Limited (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 10/26/2021. (kab)
October 26, 2021 Notice to Nihat Deniz Bayramoglu: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 11/2/2021. (kab)
October 25, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Nihat Deniz Bayramoglu Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5284457. by MByte Tech Hongkong Limited. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing of Applicant) (Ruzzier, Alexander). Motions referred to David Keesler.
October 14, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander George Ruzzier on behalf of MByte Tech Hongkong Limited (Ruzzier, Alexander)
October 12, 2021 Filing 9 DECLARATION re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by MByte Tech Hongkong Limited (DeBaugh, Arthur)
October 12, 2021 Filing 8 DECLARATION re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by MByte Tech Hongkong Limited (DeBaugh, Arthur)
October 12, 2021 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by MByte Tech Hongkong Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(DeBaugh, Arthur)
October 12, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by MByte Tech Hongkong Limited. Responses due by 10/26/2021 (DeBaugh, Arthur)
October 7, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Le Huynh on behalf of AddShoppers, Inc. (Huynh, Daniel)
October 7, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by AddShoppers, Inc.. AddShoppers, Inc. waiver sent on 10/7/2021, answer due 12/6/2021. (Huynh, Daniel)
September 29, 2021 Filing 3 REPORT on the Filing of an action regarding patent and/or trademark numbers contained in complaint. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (kab)
September 29, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to AddShoppers, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (kab)
September 29, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(kab)
September 29, 2021 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (kab)
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AddShoppers, Inc. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-5243714), filed by MByte Tech Hongkong Limited, a Hong Kong Limited Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(DeBaugh, Arthur)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MByte Tech Hongkong Limited v. AddShoppers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MByte Tech Hongkong Limited, a Hong Kong Limited Company
Represented By: Adam R. DeNobriga
Represented By: Arthur J. DeBaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MByte Tech Hongkong Limited
Represented By: Nihat Deniz Bayramoglu
Represented By: Adam R. DeNobriga
Represented By: Alexander George Ruzzier
Represented By: Arthur J. DeBaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AddShoppers, Inc. doing business as Minty.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AddShoppers, Inc. a Delaware Corporation doing business as Minty.com
Represented By: Daniel Le Huynh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?