Hicks et al v. Direct Hit Logistics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ellen Hicks and Jamie Sherman
Defendant: Direct Hit Logistics, Inc. and DHL Express (USA) Inc. doing business as DHL Express
Case Number: 3:2021cv00589
Filed: November 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Robert J Conrad
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Direct Hit Logistics, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons)(tlj)
November 17, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ellen Hicks, Jamie Sherman. DHL Express (USA) Inc. waiver sent on 11/9/2021, answer due 1/10/2022. (Osterwise, Jeffrey)
November 9, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to DHL EXPRESS (USA) INC. d.b.a. DHL EXPRESS on 11/09/2021 by Ellen Hicks, Jamie Sherman. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service for DHL)(Osterwise, Jeffrey)
November 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DHL Express (USA) Inc., Direct Hit Logistics, Inc. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-5296321), filed by Ellen Hicks, Jamie Sherman. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Consent Forms)(Osterwise, Jeffrey) Modified docket text on 11/1/2021 (kab).
November 1, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr. and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(kab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hicks et al v. Direct Hit Logistics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellen Hicks
Represented By: Jeffrey Laurence Osterwise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Sherman
Represented By: Jeffrey Laurence Osterwise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Direct Hit Logistics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DHL Express (USA) Inc. doing business as DHL Express
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?