Blake v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Andre Alexander Blake
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2021cv00603
Filed: November 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Max O Cogburn
Referring Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2021 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Andre Alexander Blake. Commissioner of Social Security served on 11/17/2021, answer due 1/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Piemonte, George)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY Order of Referral - Social Security. Pursuant to the Standing Order 3:13MC95, 28 U.S.C. 636(b) and Local Civil Rule 72.1 this case is referred to a United States Magistrate Judge to make findings of fact, conclusions of law and to recommend disposition of any dispositive motion filed through submission of a Memorandum and Recommendation to the District Judge. Case referred to Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Entered by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 12/1/2021. (ams)
November 8, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Commissioner of Social Security, US Attorney and US Attorney General. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. (kab)
November 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-5307093), filed by Andre Alexander Blake.(Piemonte, George)
November 8, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(kab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blake v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Alexander Blake
Represented By: George C. Piemonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?