McDaniel v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Tigress Sydney Acute McDaniel
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, LM Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Corporation and MIB Group, Inc
Case Number: 3:2021cv00610
Filed: November 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint #1 Complaint. MIB Group, Inc answer due 1/13/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 12/29/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mek)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by MIB Group, Inc. (Hirsch, Alexandra). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss by LM Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Liberty Mutual Fire, #2 Exhibit B - LM Insurance Corporation, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Paul Drutman)(Lang, Marie)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by LM Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. Responses due by 1/5/2022 (Lang, Marie)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 USCA Case Number 21-2400 for #6 Notice of Appeal, USCA Case Manager: Ashley Brownlee. (ejb)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #6 Notice of Appeal (js)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Pro Se NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Tigress Sydney Acute McDaniel. (js)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Original Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to Fourth Circuit re: #6 Notice of Appeal. (js)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically to US Marshal for service as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 USM285, #2 USM285, #3 USM285, #4 USM285)(brl)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to notify the United States Marshal who, pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 4(c)(3), shall serve process upon Defendants. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 11/30/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(brl)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Pro Se Exhibit by Tigress Sydney Acute McDaniel. Exhibit to #1 Complaint (js)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tigress Sydney Acute McDaniel. (js)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Pro Se COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Tigress Sydney Acute McDaniel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(js)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The order was served conventionally. (js)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Case assigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(js)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDaniel v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tigress Sydney Acute McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Marie D. Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LM Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Marie D. Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Marie D. Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIB Group, Inc
Represented By: Alexandra J. Hirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?