Young v. Ahern Rentals, Inc.
Counter Defendant: John Matthew Young
Counter Claimant: Ahern Rentals, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00612
Filed: November 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Robert J Conrad
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2021 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Defendant's Supplement to Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue by Ahern Rentals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order from District of Nevada)(Cleys, Kevin)
December 22, 2021 Filing 22 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER VENUE by Ahern Rentals, Inc.. Responses due by 1/5/2022 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cleys, Kevin). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #22 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply re PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER VENUE. Replies due by 12/30/2021. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 12/22/2021. (DLG)
December 20, 2021 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer Response to Defendant's Supplement to Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue by John Matthew Young. Replies due by 12/28/2021 (Negus, Sarah)
December 18, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #20 Motion for Leave to File Response to Supplemental Brief. Plaintiff shall filed its brief within three days of this Order. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 12/18/2021. (DLG)
December 17, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Defendant's Supplement to Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue by John Matthew Young. Responses due by 1/3/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Memorandum in Response to Defendant's Supplement to Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue) (Negus, Sarah). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
December 14, 2021 Filing 19 Supplemental Memorandum by Ahern Rentals, Inc. as to #2 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer by Ahern Rentals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - ECF 1 for District of Nevada Filing)(Cleys, Kevin)
December 10, 2021 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by John Matthew Young. (Negus, Sarah)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Edward Brandon Gaskins for John Matthew Young. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 12/9/2021. (mek)
December 9, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to E. Brandon Gaskins Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5352231. by John Matthew Young. (Festa, Taylor). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
December 8, 2021 Filing 15 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #7 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by John Matthew Young.(Negus, Sarah)
December 3, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Ahern Rentals, Inc.. Replies due by 12/10/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of M. Vawter, #2 Exhibit 1.A - Young Non-Competition Agreement, #3 Exhibit 1.B - Aherns May 2021 correspondence to JGR Equipment, #4 Exhibit 2 - Correspondence to EQS GC re Young Restrictive Covenants)(Cleys, Kevin)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added William H. Foster, III for Ahern Rentals, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 12/2/2021. (mek)
December 2, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to William H. Foster Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5341892. by Ahern Rentals, Inc.. (Cleys, Kevin). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
November 30, 2021 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Ahern Rentals, Inc.. Responses due by 12/14/2021 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cleys, Kevin). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
November 30, 2021 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Ahern Rentals, Inc.. Responses due by 12/14/2021 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cleys, Kevin). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER finding as moot #10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Defendant filed an Amended Motion which has been granted. This Motion is moot. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 11/30/2021. (DLG)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Responses due by 12/3/2021. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 11/30/2021. (DLG)
November 29, 2021 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #2 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer by John Matthew Young. Replies due by 12/6/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of John Young)(Negus, Sarah)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER denying #8 Motion to Stay. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 11/18/2021. (DLG)
November 17, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay by Ahern Rentals, Inc.. Responses due by 12/1/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum) (Cleys, Kevin). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
November 17, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against John Matthew Young by Ahern Rentals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Non-Competition, Non-Solicitation and Non-Disclosure Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - May 10, 2021 Correspondence, #3 Exhibit 3 - January 11, 2021 Order)(Cleys, Kevin)
November 17, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by John Matthew Young. Responses due by 12/1/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit A - Non-Competition Agreement) (Negus, Sarah)
November 16, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor Paige Festa on behalf of John Matthew Young (Festa, Taylor)
November 12, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ahern Rentals, Inc. (Cleys, Kevin)
November 12, 2021 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer by Ahern Rentals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Non-Competition, Non-Solicitation and Non-Disclosure Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Mike Vawter)(Cleys, Kevin)
November 12, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer by Ahern Rentals, Inc.. Responses due by 11/26/2021 (Cleys, Kevin). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
November 12, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr. and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(tlj)
November 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court, Mecklenburg County, case number 21-CVS-16148. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-5312180), filed by Ahern Rentals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit B - Notice to State Court, #4 Exhibit C - Declaration)(Cleys, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Ahern Rentals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: John Matthew Young
Represented By: Edward Brandon Gaskins
Represented By: Sarah Hayward Negus
Represented By: Taylor Paige Festa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Ahern Rentals, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Cleys
Represented By: William H. Foster, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?