Glover v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Sheila L Glover and Sheila L. Glover
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2021cv00613
Filed: November 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2022 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Sheila L. Glover. Commissioner of Social Security served on 12/27/2021, answer due 2/25/2022. (Dalton, Aaron)
December 20, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Commissioner of Social Security, US Attorney and US Attorney General. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. (ejb)
December 20, 2021 Filing Fee Received: $ 402, receipt number CHD069019 (tlj)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER (Sealed - Participants) denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall pay the required $402.00 filing fee within 30 days of entry of this Order. Failure to pay the required filing fee will result in the dismissal of this action. Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 11/18/2021. (khm)
November 18, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Fee due by 12/20/2021. (khm)
November 12, 2021 Case assigned to Chief Judge Martin Reidinger. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(tlj)
November 11, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sheila L Glover. (Dalton, Aaron)
November 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Sheila L Glover.(Dalton, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glover v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila L Glover
Represented By: Aaron Lee Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila L. Glover
Represented By: Aaron Lee Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?