Graupensperger v. Minnesota Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Aislin K Graupensperger
Defendant: Minnesota Life Insurance Company doing business as Securian Financial and Securian Financial Group, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00626
Filed: November 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2021 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Aislin K Graupensperger. Responses due by 1/3/2022 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Adler, Derek). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Responses due by 1/24/2022. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 12/20/2021. (DLG)
December 17, 2021 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss by Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Securian Financial Group, Inc.. (Niland, Ryan)
December 17, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Securian Financial Group, Inc.. Responses due by 1/3/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Minnesota Life Insurance Certificate) (Niland, Ryan). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
November 22, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer COMPLAINT by Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Securian Financial Group, Inc.. (Niland, Ryan). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer COMPLAINT. Defendants' answer due 12/17/2021. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 11/22/2021. (DLG)
November 22, 2021 Case Referral to Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. (clc)
November 19, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Securian Financial Group, Inc. (Niland, Ryan)
November 19, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Minnesota Life Insurance Company (Niland, Ryan)
November 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Mecklenburg County Superior Court, case number 21CVS16553. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-5325900), filed by Securian Financial Group, Inc., Minnesota Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Summons)(Niland, Ryan)
November 19, 2021 Case assigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(js)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graupensperger v. Minnesota Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aislin K Graupensperger
Represented By: Derek Paul Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Life Insurance Company doing business as Securian Financial
Represented By: Ryan Hunter Niland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Securian Financial Group, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Hunter Niland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?