Malik v. Amazon.com Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Miranda Malik
Defendant: Amazon.com Services, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00627
Filed: November 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Max O Cogburn
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2022 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 2/9/2022. (ams)
January 18, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Amazon.com Services, LLC.(Robinson, Mitchell)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Defendant's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Amazon.com Services, LLC answer due 1/18/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/10/22. (mga)
January 10, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to Move, Plead or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Amazon.com Services, LLC. Responses due by 1/24/2022 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Robinson, Mitchell). Motions referred to David Keesler.
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Mitchell A. Robinson for Amazon.com Services, LLC. (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF) Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/7/22. (mga) Modified text and regenerated NEF on 1/7/2022 (mga).
January 7, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Mitchell A. Robinson Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5384908. by Amazon.com Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Ramseur, Patti). Motions referred to David Keesler.
January 7, 2022 Notice to Mitchell A. Robinson: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 1/14/2022. (mga)
December 28, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amazon.com Services, LLC (Ramseur, Patti)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint. Amazon.com Services, LLC answer due 1/10/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/20/21. (mga)
December 20, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Patti West Ramseur on behalf of Amazon.com Services, LLC (Ramseur, Patti)
December 20, 2021 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by Amazon.com Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Consent Order) (Ramseur, Patti). Motions referred to David Keesler.
December 15, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Katherine Haynes on behalf of Miranda Malik (Haynes, Nicole)
November 23, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Amazon.com Services, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (tlj)
November 23, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(tlj)
November 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amazon.com Services, LLC with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-5328602), filed by Miranda Malik.(Gessner, L.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malik v. Amazon.com Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miranda Malik
Represented By: Nicole Katherine Haynes
Represented By: L. Michelle Gessner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Services, LLC
Represented By: Mitchell A. Robinson
Represented By: Patti West Ramseur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?