McBride et al v. Monroe Crossing Owner, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Rhakel McBride, Bougie Boutique and Bougie Beautique
Defendant: Monroe Crossing Owner, LLC doing business as Monroe Crossing, Time Equities Associates, LLC, Urban Retail Properties, LLC and Time Equities, Inc.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Monroe Crossing Owner, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00637
Filed: November 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Against Urban Retail Properties, LLC by Bougie Beautique, Rhakel McBride (Brown, Alesha)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss by Bougie Beautique, Rhakel McBride. Replies due by 2/1/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1- Dec of Rhakel McBride)(Brown, Alesha)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Summons Issued Electronically as to Time Equities, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (ef)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss , #8 MOTION to Dismiss Responses due by 1/25/2022 Replies due by 2/1/2022. Entered by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on January 25, 2022. (DC)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss by Bougie Beautique, Rhakel McBride. Responses due by 2/7/2022 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Brown, Alesha)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Plaintiffs, filed by Bougie Beautique, Rhakel McBride.(Brown, Alesha)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Time Equities Associates, LLC by Bougie Beautique, Rhakel McBride (Claims still Pending. Case to remain Open). (Brown, Alesha)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Monroe Crossing Owner, LLC, Time Equities Associates, LLC. Urban Retail Properties, LLC served on 1/12/2022, answer due 2/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FedEx Proof of Delivery)(Tisdale, H.)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Urban Retail Properties, LLC's Motion to Dismiss, #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Responses due by 1/25/2022 Replies due by 2/1/2022. Entered by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on January 12, 2022. (DC)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Summons Issued Electronically as to Third-Party Defendant Urban Retail Properties, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (tlj) Modified docket text on 1/18/2022. (maf)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Urban Retail Properties, LLC's Motion to Dismiss by Bougie Beautique, Rhakel McBride. Responses due by 1/25/2022 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Brown, Alesha)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal, , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Urban Retail Properties, LLC, CROSSCLAIM against Urban Retail Properties, LLC by Monroe Crossing Owner, LLC.(Tisdale, H.)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal, by Time Equities Associates, LLC.(Tisdale, H.)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss by Monroe Crossing Owner, LLC, Time Equities Associates, LLC. (Tisdale, H.)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Monroe Crossing Owner, LLC, Time Equities Associates, LLC. Responses due by 1/24/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Robert Kantor) (Tisdale, H.)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Urban Retail Properties, LLC. Responses due by 1/11/2022 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Joseph McCarthy) (Whisenant, Jefferson)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Notice of Removal, to Move, Serve an Answer, or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Monroe Crossing Owner, LLC answer due 1/10/2022; Time Equities Associates, LLC answer due 1/10/2022.. Entered by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on December 28, 2021. (DC)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Notice of Removal, to Move, Serve an Answer, or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Monroe Crossing Owner, LLC, Time Equities Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Tisdale, H.)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Ann Walker on behalf of Monroe Crossing Owner, LLC, Time Equities Associates, LLC (Walker, Kelly)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal. Urban Retail Properties, LLC answer due 12/27/2021. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/2/2021. (ams)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Urban Retail Properties, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Whisenant, Jefferson)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal . Monroe Crossing Owner, LLC answer due 12/27/2021; Time Equities Associates, LLC answer due 12/27/2021. Entered by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on December 2, 2020. (DC) Modified text on 12/2/2021; NEF regenerated (ams).
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Notice of Removal, by Monroe Crossing Owner, LLC, Time Equities Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Tisdale, H.)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Mecklenburg County Superior Court, case number 2021-CVS-17030. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-5335021), filed by Time Equities Associates, LLC, Urban Retail Properties, LLC, Monroe Crossing Owner, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Mecklenburg County File No.: 21-CVS-17030 Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit Notice of Filing Removal to Federal Court)(Tisdale, H.) Modified docket text on 11/29/2021 (tlj).
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(tlj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McBride et al v. Monroe Crossing Owner, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhakel McBride
Represented By: Alesha S. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bougie Boutique
Represented By: Alesha S. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bougie Beautique
Represented By: Alesha S. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monroe Crossing Owner, LLC doing business as Monroe Crossing
Represented By: H. Bernard Tisdale, III
Represented By: Kelly Ann Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Time Equities Associates, LLC
Represented By: H. Bernard Tisdale, III
Represented By: Kelly Ann Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Urban Retail Properties, LLC
Represented By: Jefferson Palmer Whisenant
Represented By: H. Bernard Tisdale, III
Represented By: John Allen Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Time Equities, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Monroe Crossing Owner, LLC
Represented By: H. Bernard Tisdale, III
Represented By: Kelly Ann Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?